JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 12

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 12

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 12, 2020.

Questions

1) 1002 x 516=
2) 3676 x 695=
3) 5291 x 614=
4) 3197 x 821=
5) 2973 x 777=
6) 6048 x 754=
7) 7375 x 316=
8) 3962 x 278=
9) 9895 x 910=
10) 5084 x 209=
11) 5173 x 395=
12) 2436 x 692=
13) 4088 x 985=
14) 5698 x 959=
15) 7593 x 220=
16) 5734 x 881=
17) 1671 x 802=
18) 4663 x 445=
19) 2379 x 931=
20) 7778 x 335=
21) 4084 x 664=
22) 9217 x 442=
23) 3748 x 619=
24) 1166 x 817=
25) 7751 x 926=
26) 8665 x 166=
27) 7892 x 652=
28) 7834 x 657=
29) 6484 x 138=
30) 8007 x 491=
31) 9654 x 606=
32) 9992 x 761=
33) 1274 x 465=
34) 6597 x 404=
35) 7629 x 654=
36) 8449 x 443=
37) 1751 x 433=
38) 5935 x 204=
39) 8143 x 998=
40) 8062 x 440=
41) 1693 x 408=
42) 3788 x 131=
43) 6430 x 296=
44) 6016 x 972=
45) 4930 x 511=
46) 1534 x 728=
47) 6711 x 245=
48) 9381 x 982=
49) 1531 x 665=
50) 4258 x 355=




Answers

1) 1002 * 516 = 517032 2) 3676 * 695 = 2554820 3) 5291 * 614 = 3248674 4) 3197 * 821 = 2624737 5) 2973 * 777 = 2310021 6) 6048 * 754 = 4560192 7) 7375 * 316 = 2330500 8) 3962 * 278 = 1101436 9) 9895 * 910 = 9004450 10) 5084 * 209 = 1062556 11) 5173 * 395 = 2043335 12) 2436 * 692 = 1685712 13) 4088 * 985 = 4026680 14) 5698 * 959 = 5464382 15) 7593 * 220 = 1670460 16) 5734 * 881 = 5051654 17) 1671 * 802 = 1340142 18) 4663 * 445 = 2075035 19) 2379 * 931 = 2214849 20) 7778 * 335 = 2605630 21) 4084 * 664 = 2711776 22) 9217 * 442 = 4073914 23) 3748 * 619 = 2320012 24) 1166 * 817 = 952622 25) 7751 * 926 = 7177426 26) 8665 * 166 = 1438390 27) 7892 * 652 = 5145584 28) 7834 * 657 = 5146938 29) 6484 * 138 = 894792 30) 8007 * 491 = 3931437 31) 9654 * 606 = 5850324 32) 9992 * 761 = 7603912 33) 1274 * 465 = 592410 34) 6597 * 404 = 2665188 35) 7629 * 654 = 4989366 36) 8449 * 443 = 3742907 37) 1751 * 433 = 758183 38) 5935 * 204 = 1210740 39) 8143 * 998 = 8126714 40) 8062 * 440 = 3547280 41) 1693 * 408 = 690744 42) 3788 * 131 = 496228 43) 6430 * 296 = 1903280 44) 6016 * 972 = 5847552 45) 4930 * 511 = 2519230 46) 1534 * 728 = 1116752 47) 6711 * 245 = 1644195 48) 9381 * 982 = 9212142 49) 1531 * 665 = 1018115 50) 4258 * 355 = 1511590

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 12

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 12

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets