JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 13

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 13

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 13, 2020.

Questions

1) 1205 x 654=
2) 8381 x 298=
3) 2894 x 691=
4) 1131 x 899=
5) 8236 x 820=
6) 1050 x 885=
7) 3032 x 423=
8) 2499 x 288=
9) 3083 x 736=
10) 7669 x 193=
11) 1409 x 212=
12) 9893 x 677=
13) 1970 x 247=
14) 4421 x 559=
15) 1147 x 796=
16) 1799 x 421=
17) 3663 x 424=
18) 1227 x 443=
19) 8690 x 657=
20) 4175 x 617=
21) 9291 x 890=
22) 7810 x 485=
23) 4766 x 963=
24) 9391 x 867=
25) 4270 x 142=
26) 7221 x 172=
27) 3358 x 314=
28) 2614 x 839=
29) 3646 x 660=
30) 1741 x 494=
31) 7091 x 361=
32) 3788 x 918=
33) 2661 x 992=
34) 4200 x 988=
35) 3733 x 709=
36) 9334 x 638=
37) 3962 x 543=
38) 3648 x 418=
39) 8498 x 389=
40) 6348 x 305=
41) 3513 x 132=
42) 6342 x 512=
43) 7001 x 110=
44) 2226 x 368=
45) 8789 x 339=
46) 4980 x 410=
47) 6596 x 475=
48) 4666 x 165=
49) 2257 x 574=
50) 2608 x 974=




Answers

1) 1205 * 654 = 788070 2) 8381 * 298 = 2497538 3) 2894 * 691 = 1999754 4) 1131 * 899 = 1016769 5) 8236 * 820 = 6753520 6) 1050 * 885 = 929250 7) 3032 * 423 = 1282536 8) 2499 * 288 = 719712 9) 3083 * 736 = 2269088 10) 7669 * 193 = 1480117 11) 1409 * 212 = 298708 12) 9893 * 677 = 6697561 13) 1970 * 247 = 486590 14) 4421 * 559 = 2471339 15) 1147 * 796 = 913012 16) 1799 * 421 = 757379 17) 3663 * 424 = 1553112 18) 1227 * 443 = 543561 19) 8690 * 657 = 5709330 20) 4175 * 617 = 2575975 21) 9291 * 890 = 8268990 22) 7810 * 485 = 3787850 23) 4766 * 963 = 4589658 24) 9391 * 867 = 8141997 25) 4270 * 142 = 606340 26) 7221 * 172 = 1242012 27) 3358 * 314 = 1054412 28) 2614 * 839 = 2193146 29) 3646 * 660 = 2406360 30) 1741 * 494 = 860054 31) 7091 * 361 = 2559851 32) 3788 * 918 = 3477384 33) 2661 * 992 = 2639712 34) 4200 * 988 = 4149600 35) 3733 * 709 = 2646697 36) 9334 * 638 = 5955092 37) 3962 * 543 = 2151366 38) 3648 * 418 = 1524864 39) 8498 * 389 = 3305722 40) 6348 * 305 = 1936140 41) 3513 * 132 = 463716 42) 6342 * 512 = 3247104 43) 7001 * 110 = 770110 44) 2226 * 368 = 819168 45) 8789 * 339 = 2979471 46) 4980 * 410 = 2041800 47) 6596 * 475 = 3133100 48) 4666 * 165 = 769890 49) 2257 * 574 = 1295518 50) 2608 * 974 = 2540192

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 13

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 13

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets