JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 14

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 14

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 14, 2020.

Questions

1) 7870 x 570=
2) 6648 x 179=
3) 8480 x 922=
4) 5464 x 216=
5) 2391 x 858=
6) 4246 x 239=
7) 3891 x 108=
8) 2634 x 394=
9) 6753 x 817=
10) 1500 x 559=
11) 5423 x 936=
12) 8143 x 948=
13) 3205 x 868=
14) 1688 x 479=
15) 4577 x 587=
16) 8919 x 872=
17) 2798 x 948=
18) 4358 x 501=
19) 5343 x 227=
20) 4654 x 747=
21) 7747 x 386=
22) 4430 x 847=
23) 7379 x 251=
24) 1819 x 568=
25) 9845 x 661=
26) 2654 x 886=
27) 4888 x 465=
28) 3052 x 474=
29) 5593 x 206=
30) 2170 x 127=
31) 7574 x 234=
32) 3001 x 712=
33) 8935 x 247=
34) 7560 x 213=
35) 8670 x 584=
36) 2644 x 363=
37) 6872 x 921=
38) 5199 x 444=
39) 8186 x 765=
40) 6960 x 283=
41) 2800 x 884=
42) 5426 x 836=
43) 2939 x 837=
44) 5288 x 378=
45) 7160 x 884=
46) 8129 x 876=
47) 9097 x 716=
48) 3978 x 411=
49) 5170 x 537=
50) 5821 x 943=




Answers

1) 7870 * 570 = 4485900 2) 6648 * 179 = 1189992 3) 8480 * 922 = 7818560 4) 5464 * 216 = 1180224 5) 2391 * 858 = 2051478 6) 4246 * 239 = 1014794 7) 3891 * 108 = 420228 8) 2634 * 394 = 1037796 9) 6753 * 817 = 5517201 10) 1500 * 559 = 838500 11) 5423 * 936 = 5075928 12) 8143 * 948 = 7719564 13) 3205 * 868 = 2781940 14) 1688 * 479 = 808552 15) 4577 * 587 = 2686699 16) 8919 * 872 = 7777368 17) 2798 * 948 = 2652504 18) 4358 * 501 = 2183358 19) 5343 * 227 = 1212861 20) 4654 * 747 = 3476538 21) 7747 * 386 = 2990342 22) 4430 * 847 = 3752210 23) 7379 * 251 = 1852129 24) 1819 * 568 = 1033192 25) 9845 * 661 = 6507545 26) 2654 * 886 = 2351444 27) 4888 * 465 = 2272920 28) 3052 * 474 = 1446648 29) 5593 * 206 = 1152158 30) 2170 * 127 = 275590 31) 7574 * 234 = 1772316 32) 3001 * 712 = 2136712 33) 8935 * 247 = 2206945 34) 7560 * 213 = 1610280 35) 8670 * 584 = 5063280 36) 2644 * 363 = 959772 37) 6872 * 921 = 6329112 38) 5199 * 444 = 2308356 39) 8186 * 765 = 6262290 40) 6960 * 283 = 1969680 41) 2800 * 884 = 2475200 42) 5426 * 836 = 4536136 43) 2939 * 837 = 2459943 44) 5288 * 378 = 1998864 45) 7160 * 884 = 6329440 46) 8129 * 876 = 7121004 47) 9097 * 716 = 6513452 48) 3978 * 411 = 1634958 49) 5170 * 537 = 2776290 50) 5821 * 943 = 5489203

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 14

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 14

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets