JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 15

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 15

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 15, 2020.

Questions

1) 9772 x 855=
2) 8305 x 576=
3) 4940 x 893=
4) 5810 x 719=
5) 4280 x 123=
6) 7551 x 632=
7) 5076 x 534=
8) 7197 x 312=
9) 2871 x 337=
10) 1286 x 595=
11) 6576 x 173=
12) 7994 x 327=
13) 4435 x 884=
14) 2662 x 538=
15) 4550 x 474=
16) 5747 x 866=
17) 3432 x 275=
18) 2043 x 982=
19) 3548 x 872=
20) 1911 x 556=
21) 1476 x 255=
22) 7934 x 806=
23) 7471 x 551=
24) 8024 x 270=
25) 3779 x 721=
26) 1925 x 274=
27) 5135 x 235=
28) 2071 x 477=
29) 6477 x 284=
30) 9568 x 513=
31) 2964 x 957=
32) 7829 x 790=
33) 2738 x 763=
34) 2491 x 888=
35) 9411 x 840=
36) 7611 x 827=
37) 3434 x 335=
38) 3219 x 306=
39) 5948 x 324=
40) 3686 x 515=
41) 9698 x 110=
42) 5354 x 908=
43) 4871 x 814=
44) 3880 x 749=
45) 4886 x 773=
46) 7237 x 326=
47) 3171 x 378=
48) 5524 x 485=
49) 4363 x 698=
50) 4879 x 172=




Answers

1) 9772 * 855 = 8355060 2) 8305 * 576 = 4783680 3) 4940 * 893 = 4411420 4) 5810 * 719 = 4177390 5) 4280 * 123 = 526440 6) 7551 * 632 = 4772232 7) 5076 * 534 = 2710584 8) 7197 * 312 = 2245464 9) 2871 * 337 = 967527 10) 1286 * 595 = 765170 11) 6576 * 173 = 1137648 12) 7994 * 327 = 2614038 13) 4435 * 884 = 3920540 14) 2662 * 538 = 1432156 15) 4550 * 474 = 2156700 16) 5747 * 866 = 4976902 17) 3432 * 275 = 943800 18) 2043 * 982 = 2006226 19) 3548 * 872 = 3093856 20) 1911 * 556 = 1062516 21) 1476 * 255 = 376380 22) 7934 * 806 = 6394804 23) 7471 * 551 = 4116521 24) 8024 * 270 = 2166480 25) 3779 * 721 = 2724659 26) 1925 * 274 = 527450 27) 5135 * 235 = 1206725 28) 2071 * 477 = 987867 29) 6477 * 284 = 1839468 30) 9568 * 513 = 4908384 31) 2964 * 957 = 2836548 32) 7829 * 790 = 6184910 33) 2738 * 763 = 2089094 34) 2491 * 888 = 2212008 35) 9411 * 840 = 7905240 36) 7611 * 827 = 6294297 37) 3434 * 335 = 1150390 38) 3219 * 306 = 985014 39) 5948 * 324 = 1927152 40) 3686 * 515 = 1898290 41) 9698 * 110 = 1066780 42) 5354 * 908 = 4861432 43) 4871 * 814 = 3964994 44) 3880 * 749 = 2906120 45) 4886 * 773 = 3776878 46) 7237 * 326 = 2359262 47) 3171 * 378 = 1198638 48) 5524 * 485 = 2679140 49) 4363 * 698 = 3045374 50) 4879 * 172 = 839188

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 15

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 15

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets