JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 16

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 16

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 16, 2020.

Questions

1) 2202 x 270=
2) 9128 x 958=
3) 3103 x 487=
4) 5108 x 808=
5) 6462 x 526=
6) 2258 x 273=
7) 6584 x 124=
8) 3624 x 423=
9) 2289 x 250=
10) 6024 x 810=
11) 5261 x 646=
12) 2848 x 813=
13) 7409 x 156=
14) 1508 x 659=
15) 4848 x 324=
16) 5432 x 593=
17) 1452 x 730=
18) 6905 x 235=
19) 1527 x 106=
20) 5716 x 595=
21) 9626 x 829=
22) 8633 x 304=
23) 8624 x 121=
24) 8208 x 729=
25) 2716 x 578=
26) 8005 x 569=
27) 1590 x 873=
28) 3654 x 330=
29) 8126 x 599=
30) 3075 x 673=
31) 6674 x 776=
32) 1403 x 340=
33) 3638 x 518=
34) 2187 x 692=
35) 9866 x 811=
36) 5163 x 402=
37) 8428 x 195=
38) 2424 x 946=
39) 6029 x 171=
40) 2286 x 586=
41) 6464 x 231=
42) 5872 x 100=
43) 4396 x 174=
44) 8950 x 218=
45) 9626 x 944=
46) 9188 x 233=
47) 8559 x 852=
48) 6024 x 634=
49) 7213 x 493=
50) 6579 x 698=




Answers

1) 2202 * 270 = 594540 2) 9128 * 958 = 8744624 3) 3103 * 487 = 1511161 4) 5108 * 808 = 4127264 5) 6462 * 526 = 3399012 6) 2258 * 273 = 616434 7) 6584 * 124 = 816416 8) 3624 * 423 = 1532952 9) 2289 * 250 = 572250 10) 6024 * 810 = 4879440 11) 5261 * 646 = 3398606 12) 2848 * 813 = 2315424 13) 7409 * 156 = 1155804 14) 1508 * 659 = 993772 15) 4848 * 324 = 1570752 16) 5432 * 593 = 3221176 17) 1452 * 730 = 1059960 18) 6905 * 235 = 1622675 19) 1527 * 106 = 161862 20) 5716 * 595 = 3401020 21) 9626 * 829 = 7979954 22) 8633 * 304 = 2624432 23) 8624 * 121 = 1043504 24) 8208 * 729 = 5983632 25) 2716 * 578 = 1569848 26) 8005 * 569 = 4554845 27) 1590 * 873 = 1388070 28) 3654 * 330 = 1205820 29) 8126 * 599 = 4867474 30) 3075 * 673 = 2069475 31) 6674 * 776 = 5179024 32) 1403 * 340 = 477020 33) 3638 * 518 = 1884484 34) 2187 * 692 = 1513404 35) 9866 * 811 = 8001326 36) 5163 * 402 = 2075526 37) 8428 * 195 = 1643460 38) 2424 * 946 = 2293104 39) 6029 * 171 = 1030959 40) 2286 * 586 = 1339596 41) 6464 * 231 = 1493184 42) 5872 * 100 = 587200 43) 4396 * 174 = 764904 44) 8950 * 218 = 1951100 45) 9626 * 944 = 9086944 46) 9188 * 233 = 2140804 47) 8559 * 852 = 7292268 48) 6024 * 634 = 3819216 49) 7213 * 493 = 3556009 50) 6579 * 698 = 4592142

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 16

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 16

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets