JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 17

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 17

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 17, 2020.

Questions

1) 2965 x 160=
2) 7911 x 492=
3) 8841 x 765=
4) 4432 x 526=
5) 5503 x 959=
6) 1309 x 439=
7) 1450 x 957=
8) 6559 x 581=
9) 6085 x 277=
10) 3381 x 467=
11) 7714 x 241=
12) 1974 x 895=
13) 8740 x 426=
14) 1310 x 342=
15) 9933 x 962=
16) 4240 x 980=
17) 8404 x 244=
18) 5013 x 240=
19) 6374 x 142=
20) 1129 x 169=
21) 9275 x 715=
22) 2231 x 386=
23) 8566 x 772=
24) 2251 x 548=
25) 1945 x 933=
26) 8143 x 714=
27) 6085 x 646=
28) 7569 x 391=
29) 6130 x 840=
30) 4984 x 635=
31) 4886 x 544=
32) 6274 x 533=
33) 7202 x 989=
34) 5820 x 106=
35) 4851 x 914=
36) 1238 x 846=
37) 8884 x 534=
38) 9338 x 858=
39) 4148 x 975=
40) 2272 x 416=
41) 9169 x 478=
42) 3228 x 784=
43) 8517 x 964=
44) 8641 x 801=
45) 6791 x 144=
46) 2381 x 728=
47) 3712 x 333=
48) 6293 x 386=
49) 8720 x 354=
50) 1320 x 643=




Answers

1) 2965 * 160 = 474400 2) 7911 * 492 = 3892212 3) 8841 * 765 = 6763365 4) 4432 * 526 = 2331232 5) 5503 * 959 = 5277377 6) 1309 * 439 = 574651 7) 1450 * 957 = 1387650 8) 6559 * 581 = 3810779 9) 6085 * 277 = 1685545 10) 3381 * 467 = 1578927 11) 7714 * 241 = 1859074 12) 1974 * 895 = 1766730 13) 8740 * 426 = 3723240 14) 1310 * 342 = 448020 15) 9933 * 962 = 9555546 16) 4240 * 980 = 4155200 17) 8404 * 244 = 2050576 18) 5013 * 240 = 1203120 19) 6374 * 142 = 905108 20) 1129 * 169 = 190801 21) 9275 * 715 = 6631625 22) 2231 * 386 = 861166 23) 8566 * 772 = 6612952 24) 2251 * 548 = 1233548 25) 1945 * 933 = 1814685 26) 8143 * 714 = 5814102 27) 6085 * 646 = 3930910 28) 7569 * 391 = 2959479 29) 6130 * 840 = 5149200 30) 4984 * 635 = 3164840 31) 4886 * 544 = 2657984 32) 6274 * 533 = 3344042 33) 7202 * 989 = 7122778 34) 5820 * 106 = 616920 35) 4851 * 914 = 4433814 36) 1238 * 846 = 1047348 37) 8884 * 534 = 4744056 38) 9338 * 858 = 8012004 39) 4148 * 975 = 4044300 40) 2272 * 416 = 945152 41) 9169 * 478 = 4382782 42) 3228 * 784 = 2530752 43) 8517 * 964 = 8210388 44) 8641 * 801 = 6921441 45) 6791 * 144 = 977904 46) 2381 * 728 = 1733368 47) 3712 * 333 = 1236096 48) 6293 * 386 = 2429098 49) 8720 * 354 = 3086880 50) 1320 * 643 = 848760

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 17

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 17

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets