JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 18

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 18

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 18, 2020.

Questions

1) 7320 x 104=
2) 6064 x 333=
3) 6452 x 996=
4) 5610 x 722=
5) 8709 x 550=
6) 2761 x 931=
7) 7035 x 322=
8) 5808 x 353=
9) 6486 x 652=
10) 4893 x 270=
11) 7217 x 846=
12) 1565 x 374=
13) 8256 x 117=
14) 2993 x 960=
15) 7442 x 442=
16) 4395 x 296=
17) 7896 x 899=
18) 1901 x 649=
19) 6731 x 295=
20) 9991 x 272=
21) 9006 x 536=
22) 7993 x 232=
23) 4231 x 769=
24) 5596 x 671=
25) 7638 x 360=
26) 6964 x 444=
27) 9479 x 125=
28) 4900 x 166=
29) 4128 x 404=
30) 1810 x 947=
31) 1283 x 785=
32) 1146 x 610=
33) 9366 x 121=
34) 7435 x 452=
35) 8388 x 726=
36) 6729 x 693=
37) 5800 x 277=
38) 2745 x 763=
39) 9895 x 491=
40) 2679 x 778=
41) 6758 x 315=
42) 3029 x 702=
43) 5381 x 440=
44) 2707 x 627=
45) 4232 x 682=
46) 5214 x 748=
47) 3091 x 586=
48) 9652 x 631=
49) 6479 x 652=
50) 3087 x 849=




Answers

1) 7320 * 104 = 761280 2) 6064 * 333 = 2019312 3) 6452 * 996 = 6426192 4) 5610 * 722 = 4050420 5) 8709 * 550 = 4789950 6) 2761 * 931 = 2570491 7) 7035 * 322 = 2265270 8) 5808 * 353 = 2050224 9) 6486 * 652 = 4228872 10) 4893 * 270 = 1321110 11) 7217 * 846 = 6105582 12) 1565 * 374 = 585310 13) 8256 * 117 = 965952 14) 2993 * 960 = 2873280 15) 7442 * 442 = 3289364 16) 4395 * 296 = 1300920 17) 7896 * 899 = 7098504 18) 1901 * 649 = 1233749 19) 6731 * 295 = 1985645 20) 9991 * 272 = 2717552 21) 9006 * 536 = 4827216 22) 7993 * 232 = 1854376 23) 4231 * 769 = 3253639 24) 5596 * 671 = 3754916 25) 7638 * 360 = 2749680 26) 6964 * 444 = 3092016 27) 9479 * 125 = 1184875 28) 4900 * 166 = 813400 29) 4128 * 404 = 1667712 30) 1810 * 947 = 1714070 31) 1283 * 785 = 1007155 32) 1146 * 610 = 699060 33) 9366 * 121 = 1133286 34) 7435 * 452 = 3360620 35) 8388 * 726 = 6089688 36) 6729 * 693 = 4663197 37) 5800 * 277 = 1606600 38) 2745 * 763 = 2094435 39) 9895 * 491 = 4858445 40) 2679 * 778 = 2084262 41) 6758 * 315 = 2128770 42) 3029 * 702 = 2126358 43) 5381 * 440 = 2367640 44) 2707 * 627 = 1697289 45) 4232 * 682 = 2886224 46) 5214 * 748 = 3900072 47) 3091 * 586 = 1811326 48) 9652 * 631 = 6090412 49) 6479 * 652 = 4224308 50) 3087 * 849 = 2620863

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 18

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 18

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets