JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 19

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 19

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 19, 2020.

Questions

1) 1491 x 678=
2) 4114 x 162=
3) 1830 x 371=
4) 1182 x 116=
5) 5273 x 420=
6) 4350 x 667=
7) 8626 x 293=
8) 3823 x 390=
9) 5111 x 129=
10) 5513 x 756=
11) 1911 x 872=
12) 7775 x 591=
13) 5280 x 133=
14) 5447 x 610=
15) 4925 x 103=
16) 9584 x 479=
17) 4841 x 508=
18) 7302 x 791=
19) 4954 x 563=
20) 2889 x 838=
21) 1791 x 712=
22) 6440 x 515=
23) 7674 x 334=
24) 9890 x 447=
25) 2380 x 367=
26) 7682 x 182=
27) 6914 x 439=
28) 2731 x 133=
29) 1042 x 596=
30) 5534 x 197=
31) 5404 x 759=
32) 9265 x 667=
33) 9149 x 720=
34) 9297 x 446=
35) 4363 x 346=
36) 7184 x 831=
37) 3438 x 538=
38) 2382 x 410=
39) 2368 x 678=
40) 1587 x 762=
41) 7445 x 623=
42) 6637 x 914=
43) 9864 x 675=
44) 9383 x 437=
45) 7398 x 653=
46) 3013 x 298=
47) 6561 x 488=
48) 1024 x 824=
49) 1279 x 277=
50) 3424 x 644=




Answers

1) 1491 * 678 = 1010898 2) 4114 * 162 = 666468 3) 1830 * 371 = 678930 4) 1182 * 116 = 137112 5) 5273 * 420 = 2214660 6) 4350 * 667 = 2901450 7) 8626 * 293 = 2527418 8) 3823 * 390 = 1490970 9) 5111 * 129 = 659319 10) 5513 * 756 = 4167828 11) 1911 * 872 = 1666392 12) 7775 * 591 = 4595025 13) 5280 * 133 = 702240 14) 5447 * 610 = 3322670 15) 4925 * 103 = 507275 16) 9584 * 479 = 4590736 17) 4841 * 508 = 2459228 18) 7302 * 791 = 5775882 19) 4954 * 563 = 2789102 20) 2889 * 838 = 2420982 21) 1791 * 712 = 1275192 22) 6440 * 515 = 3316600 23) 7674 * 334 = 2563116 24) 9890 * 447 = 4420830 25) 2380 * 367 = 873460 26) 7682 * 182 = 1398124 27) 6914 * 439 = 3035246 28) 2731 * 133 = 363223 29) 1042 * 596 = 621032 30) 5534 * 197 = 1090198 31) 5404 * 759 = 4101636 32) 9265 * 667 = 6179755 33) 9149 * 720 = 6587280 34) 9297 * 446 = 4146462 35) 4363 * 346 = 1509598 36) 7184 * 831 = 5969904 37) 3438 * 538 = 1849644 38) 2382 * 410 = 976620 39) 2368 * 678 = 1605504 40) 1587 * 762 = 1209294 41) 7445 * 623 = 4638235 42) 6637 * 914 = 6066218 43) 9864 * 675 = 6658200 44) 9383 * 437 = 4100371 45) 7398 * 653 = 4830894 46) 3013 * 298 = 897874 47) 6561 * 488 = 3201768 48) 1024 * 824 = 843776 49) 1279 * 277 = 354283 50) 3424 * 644 = 2205056

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 19

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 19

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets