JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 2

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 2

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 2, 2020.

Questions

1) 2288 x 639=
2) 8937 x 408=
3) 3687 x 524=
4) 3070 x 186=
5) 9773 x 971=
6) 5393 x 600=
7) 3011 x 688=
8) 8650 x 800=
9) 9950 x 788=
10) 7926 x 215=
11) 9538 x 804=
12) 6197 x 767=
13) 6777 x 339=
14) 2644 x 190=
15) 6746 x 203=
16) 1920 x 201=
17) 9179 x 329=
18) 2521 x 815=
19) 4875 x 553=
20) 3516 x 149=
21) 8746 x 318=
22) 8606 x 908=
23) 5221 x 172=
24) 6605 x 541=
25) 6790 x 387=
26) 6339 x 921=
27) 3922 x 727=
28) 4807 x 100=
29) 2458 x 405=
30) 1201 x 820=
31) 4737 x 731=
32) 1833 x 716=
33) 4469 x 336=
34) 6150 x 885=
35) 8093 x 694=
36) 6010 x 116=
37) 4281 x 946=
38) 4861 x 769=
39) 7082 x 356=
40) 5222 x 354=
41) 7760 x 175=
42) 7227 x 375=
43) 1518 x 358=
44) 8775 x 395=
45) 4953 x 810=
46) 4808 x 156=
47) 5606 x 815=
48) 2669 x 927=
49) 7595 x 873=
50) 1051 x 198=




Answers

1) 2288 * 639 = 1462032 2) 8937 * 408 = 3646296 3) 3687 * 524 = 1931988 4) 3070 * 186 = 571020 5) 9773 * 971 = 9489583 6) 5393 * 600 = 3235800 7) 3011 * 688 = 2071568 8) 8650 * 800 = 6920000 9) 9950 * 788 = 7840600 10) 7926 * 215 = 1704090 11) 9538 * 804 = 7668552 12) 6197 * 767 = 4753099 13) 6777 * 339 = 2297403 14) 2644 * 190 = 502360 15) 6746 * 203 = 1369438 16) 1920 * 201 = 385920 17) 9179 * 329 = 3019891 18) 2521 * 815 = 2054615 19) 4875 * 553 = 2695875 20) 3516 * 149 = 523884 21) 8746 * 318 = 2781228 22) 8606 * 908 = 7814248 23) 5221 * 172 = 898012 24) 6605 * 541 = 3573305 25) 6790 * 387 = 2627730 26) 6339 * 921 = 5838219 27) 3922 * 727 = 2851294 28) 4807 * 100 = 480700 29) 2458 * 405 = 995490 30) 1201 * 820 = 984820 31) 4737 * 731 = 3462747 32) 1833 * 716 = 1312428 33) 4469 * 336 = 1501584 34) 6150 * 885 = 5442750 35) 8093 * 694 = 5616542 36) 6010 * 116 = 697160 37) 4281 * 946 = 4049826 38) 4861 * 769 = 3738109 39) 7082 * 356 = 2521192 40) 5222 * 354 = 1848588 41) 7760 * 175 = 1358000 42) 7227 * 375 = 2710125 43) 1518 * 358 = 543444 44) 8775 * 395 = 3466125 45) 4953 * 810 = 4011930 46) 4808 * 156 = 750048 47) 5606 * 815 = 4568890 48) 2669 * 927 = 2474163 49) 7595 * 873 = 6630435 50) 1051 * 198 = 208098

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 2

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 2

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets