JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 20

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 20

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 20, 2020.

Questions

1) 3355 x 494=
2) 7153 x 855=
3) 2644 x 366=
4) 2557 x 930=
5) 2284 x 399=
6) 8205 x 501=
7) 2599 x 236=
8) 3605 x 165=
9) 9440 x 221=
10) 6995 x 666=
11) 2880 x 973=
12) 1684 x 957=
13) 5019 x 514=
14) 8032 x 540=
15) 2491 x 179=
16) 1101 x 237=
17) 5833 x 346=
18) 9048 x 827=
19) 3178 x 703=
20) 4727 x 308=
21) 3352 x 248=
22) 7427 x 568=
23) 9294 x 321=
24) 5981 x 504=
25) 9298 x 297=
26) 3702 x 812=
27) 5308 x 434=
28) 6837 x 175=
29) 9732 x 394=
30) 5899 x 716=
31) 5600 x 409=
32) 8584 x 347=
33) 8971 x 300=
34) 5567 x 912=
35) 5118 x 741=
36) 4449 x 250=
37) 6847 x 965=
38) 3345 x 294=
39) 7057 x 578=
40) 9971 x 360=
41) 4265 x 979=
42) 5683 x 615=
43) 3003 x 633=
44) 1763 x 876=
45) 3352 x 352=
46) 5024 x 664=
47) 7726 x 694=
48) 6988 x 184=
49) 2580 x 784=
50) 2258 x 677=




Answers

1) 3355 * 494 = 1657370 2) 7153 * 855 = 6115815 3) 2644 * 366 = 967704 4) 2557 * 930 = 2378010 5) 2284 * 399 = 911316 6) 8205 * 501 = 4110705 7) 2599 * 236 = 613364 8) 3605 * 165 = 594825 9) 9440 * 221 = 2086240 10) 6995 * 666 = 4658670 11) 2880 * 973 = 2802240 12) 1684 * 957 = 1611588 13) 5019 * 514 = 2579766 14) 8032 * 540 = 4337280 15) 2491 * 179 = 445889 16) 1101 * 237 = 260937 17) 5833 * 346 = 2018218 18) 9048 * 827 = 7482696 19) 3178 * 703 = 2234134 20) 4727 * 308 = 1455916 21) 3352 * 248 = 831296 22) 7427 * 568 = 4218536 23) 9294 * 321 = 2983374 24) 5981 * 504 = 3014424 25) 9298 * 297 = 2761506 26) 3702 * 812 = 3006024 27) 5308 * 434 = 2303672 28) 6837 * 175 = 1196475 29) 9732 * 394 = 3834408 30) 5899 * 716 = 4223684 31) 5600 * 409 = 2290400 32) 8584 * 347 = 2978648 33) 8971 * 300 = 2691300 34) 5567 * 912 = 5077104 35) 5118 * 741 = 3792438 36) 4449 * 250 = 1112250 37) 6847 * 965 = 6607355 38) 3345 * 294 = 983430 39) 7057 * 578 = 4078946 40) 9971 * 360 = 3589560 41) 4265 * 979 = 4175435 42) 5683 * 615 = 3495045 43) 3003 * 633 = 1900899 44) 1763 * 876 = 1544388 45) 3352 * 352 = 1179904 46) 5024 * 664 = 3335936 47) 7726 * 694 = 5361844 48) 6988 * 184 = 1285792 49) 2580 * 784 = 2022720 50) 2258 * 677 = 1528666

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 20

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 20

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets