JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 21

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 21

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 21, 2020.

Questions

1) 9046 x 723=
2) 2930 x 654=
3) 3905 x 998=
4) 8273 x 327=
5) 6772 x 135=
6) 6276 x 303=
7) 6560 x 163=
8) 6233 x 145=
9) 5429 x 815=
10) 8120 x 571=
11) 8692 x 381=
12) 7830 x 531=
13) 4512 x 730=
14) 1611 x 605=
15) 3413 x 682=
16) 9792 x 729=
17) 9273 x 787=
18) 6957 x 463=
19) 2462 x 113=
20) 5809 x 940=
21) 6854 x 377=
22) 7168 x 991=
23) 8608 x 690=
24) 5368 x 124=
25) 2712 x 866=
26) 5768 x 978=
27) 5186 x 290=
28) 8947 x 153=
29) 9766 x 549=
30) 1419 x 185=
31) 6753 x 324=
32) 4539 x 752=
33) 2978 x 230=
34) 8730 x 271=
35) 7095 x 561=
36) 8305 x 855=
37) 5344 x 316=
38) 6054 x 182=
39) 9126 x 714=
40) 8749 x 610=
41) 5196 x 315=
42) 6858 x 398=
43) 9967 x 244=
44) 9299 x 240=
45) 3367 x 316=
46) 3260 x 868=
47) 1659 x 265=
48) 7280 x 270=
49) 7202 x 248=
50) 1350 x 406=




Answers

1) 9046 * 723 = 6540258 2) 2930 * 654 = 1916220 3) 3905 * 998 = 3897190 4) 8273 * 327 = 2705271 5) 6772 * 135 = 914220 6) 6276 * 303 = 1901628 7) 6560 * 163 = 1069280 8) 6233 * 145 = 903785 9) 5429 * 815 = 4424635 10) 8120 * 571 = 4636520 11) 8692 * 381 = 3311652 12) 7830 * 531 = 4157730 13) 4512 * 730 = 3293760 14) 1611 * 605 = 974655 15) 3413 * 682 = 2327666 16) 9792 * 729 = 7138368 17) 9273 * 787 = 7297851 18) 6957 * 463 = 3221091 19) 2462 * 113 = 278206 20) 5809 * 940 = 5460460 21) 6854 * 377 = 2583958 22) 7168 * 991 = 7103488 23) 8608 * 690 = 5939520 24) 5368 * 124 = 665632 25) 2712 * 866 = 2348592 26) 5768 * 978 = 5641104 27) 5186 * 290 = 1503940 28) 8947 * 153 = 1368891 29) 9766 * 549 = 5361534 30) 1419 * 185 = 262515 31) 6753 * 324 = 2187972 32) 4539 * 752 = 3413328 33) 2978 * 230 = 684940 34) 8730 * 271 = 2365830 35) 7095 * 561 = 3980295 36) 8305 * 855 = 7100775 37) 5344 * 316 = 1688704 38) 6054 * 182 = 1101828 39) 9126 * 714 = 6515964 40) 8749 * 610 = 5336890 41) 5196 * 315 = 1636740 42) 6858 * 398 = 2729484 43) 9967 * 244 = 2431948 44) 9299 * 240 = 2231760 45) 3367 * 316 = 1063972 46) 3260 * 868 = 2829680 47) 1659 * 265 = 439635 48) 7280 * 270 = 1965600 49) 7202 * 248 = 1786096 50) 1350 * 406 = 548100

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 21

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 21

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets