JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 22

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 22

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 22, 2020.

Questions

1) 5433 x 894=
2) 9741 x 661=
3) 1111 x 326=
4) 3593 x 670=
5) 3611 x 237=
6) 9813 x 313=
7) 7007 x 112=
8) 2077 x 721=
9) 9805 x 527=
10) 4782 x 144=
11) 9391 x 936=
12) 4129 x 587=
13) 5347 x 741=
14) 5874 x 237=
15) 2755 x 964=
16) 4219 x 555=
17) 4632 x 997=
18) 8857 x 223=
19) 3052 x 299=
20) 4506 x 897=
21) 8218 x 988=
22) 4554 x 500=
23) 3668 x 383=
24) 7482 x 182=
25) 7928 x 235=
26) 3523 x 769=
27) 8166 x 458=
28) 5843 x 925=
29) 6967 x 397=
30) 1842 x 343=
31) 4584 x 841=
32) 2310 x 504=
33) 2787 x 966=
34) 1905 x 569=
35) 5708 x 693=
36) 3950 x 585=
37) 1741 x 258=
38) 4144 x 826=
39) 6919 x 674=
40) 8139 x 449=
41) 1068 x 899=
42) 2271 x 259=
43) 3850 x 366=
44) 3557 x 657=
45) 2846 x 679=
46) 9498 x 574=
47) 9116 x 532=
48) 8224 x 229=
49) 8775 x 406=
50) 7368 x 767=




Answers

1) 5433 * 894 = 4857102 2) 9741 * 661 = 6438801 3) 1111 * 326 = 362186 4) 3593 * 670 = 2407310 5) 3611 * 237 = 855807 6) 9813 * 313 = 3071469 7) 7007 * 112 = 784784 8) 2077 * 721 = 1497517 9) 9805 * 527 = 5167235 10) 4782 * 144 = 688608 11) 9391 * 936 = 8789976 12) 4129 * 587 = 2423723 13) 5347 * 741 = 3962127 14) 5874 * 237 = 1392138 15) 2755 * 964 = 2655820 16) 4219 * 555 = 2341545 17) 4632 * 997 = 4618104 18) 8857 * 223 = 1975111 19) 3052 * 299 = 912548 20) 4506 * 897 = 4041882 21) 8218 * 988 = 8119384 22) 4554 * 500 = 2277000 23) 3668 * 383 = 1404844 24) 7482 * 182 = 1361724 25) 7928 * 235 = 1863080 26) 3523 * 769 = 2709187 27) 8166 * 458 = 3740028 28) 5843 * 925 = 5404775 29) 6967 * 397 = 2765899 30) 1842 * 343 = 631806 31) 4584 * 841 = 3855144 32) 2310 * 504 = 1164240 33) 2787 * 966 = 2692242 34) 1905 * 569 = 1083945 35) 5708 * 693 = 3955644 36) 3950 * 585 = 2310750 37) 1741 * 258 = 449178 38) 4144 * 826 = 3422944 39) 6919 * 674 = 4663406 40) 8139 * 449 = 3654411 41) 1068 * 899 = 960132 42) 2271 * 259 = 588189 43) 3850 * 366 = 1409100 44) 3557 * 657 = 2336949 45) 2846 * 679 = 1932434 46) 9498 * 574 = 5451852 47) 9116 * 532 = 4849712 48) 8224 * 229 = 1883296 49) 8775 * 406 = 3562650 50) 7368 * 767 = 5651256

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 22

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 22

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets