JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 23

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 23

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 23, 2020.

Questions

1) 8351 x 621=
2) 6225 x 494=
3) 4240 x 305=
4) 2111 x 732=
5) 2592 x 722=
6) 3924 x 860=
7) 4522 x 760=
8) 2814 x 445=
9) 9864 x 666=
10) 3661 x 473=
11) 5448 x 299=
12) 9580 x 941=
13) 4846 x 872=
14) 1213 x 568=
15) 2133 x 402=
16) 9312 x 463=
17) 1448 x 574=
18) 9066 x 294=
19) 7885 x 809=
20) 8659 x 881=
21) 1065 x 780=
22) 2389 x 105=
23) 3568 x 661=
24) 3574 x 818=
25) 3795 x 377=
26) 2168 x 472=
27) 5101 x 658=
28) 5301 x 557=
29) 9661 x 635=
30) 9588 x 478=
31) 2847 x 260=
32) 3011 x 192=
33) 5092 x 317=
34) 2562 x 892=
35) 1656 x 555=
36) 9335 x 177=
37) 2387 x 368=
38) 2682 x 238=
39) 9332 x 239=
40) 2841 x 753=
41) 6834 x 897=
42) 7480 x 245=
43) 8338 x 628=
44) 7998 x 600=
45) 8952 x 958=
46) 1205 x 408=
47) 4649 x 656=
48) 2794 x 337=
49) 9861 x 228=
50) 7077 x 627=




Answers

1) 8351 * 621 = 5185971 2) 6225 * 494 = 3075150 3) 4240 * 305 = 1293200 4) 2111 * 732 = 1545252 5) 2592 * 722 = 1871424 6) 3924 * 860 = 3374640 7) 4522 * 760 = 3436720 8) 2814 * 445 = 1252230 9) 9864 * 666 = 6569424 10) 3661 * 473 = 1731653 11) 5448 * 299 = 1628952 12) 9580 * 941 = 9014780 13) 4846 * 872 = 4225712 14) 1213 * 568 = 688984 15) 2133 * 402 = 857466 16) 9312 * 463 = 4311456 17) 1448 * 574 = 831152 18) 9066 * 294 = 2665404 19) 7885 * 809 = 6378965 20) 8659 * 881 = 7628579 21) 1065 * 780 = 830700 22) 2389 * 105 = 250845 23) 3568 * 661 = 2358448 24) 3574 * 818 = 2923532 25) 3795 * 377 = 1430715 26) 2168 * 472 = 1023296 27) 5101 * 658 = 3356458 28) 5301 * 557 = 2952657 29) 9661 * 635 = 6134735 30) 9588 * 478 = 4583064 31) 2847 * 260 = 740220 32) 3011 * 192 = 578112 33) 5092 * 317 = 1614164 34) 2562 * 892 = 2285304 35) 1656 * 555 = 919080 36) 9335 * 177 = 1652295 37) 2387 * 368 = 878416 38) 2682 * 238 = 638316 39) 9332 * 239 = 2230348 40) 2841 * 753 = 2139273 41) 6834 * 897 = 6130098 42) 7480 * 245 = 1832600 43) 8338 * 628 = 5236264 44) 7998 * 600 = 4798800 45) 8952 * 958 = 8576016 46) 1205 * 408 = 491640 47) 4649 * 656 = 3049744 48) 2794 * 337 = 941578 49) 9861 * 228 = 2248308 50) 7077 * 627 = 4437279

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 23

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 23

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets