JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 24

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 24

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 24, 2020.

Questions

1) 3913 x 684=
2) 4800 x 358=
3) 4044 x 926=
4) 9320 x 228=
5) 8364 x 191=
6) 6691 x 279=
7) 6663 x 587=
8) 6804 x 864=
9) 8803 x 944=
10) 7528 x 591=
11) 3500 x 139=
12) 3304 x 770=
13) 3098 x 285=
14) 8620 x 186=
15) 7451 x 628=
16) 7028 x 171=
17) 9614 x 589=
18) 1027 x 815=
19) 6744 x 583=
20) 3435 x 908=
21) 9213 x 325=
22) 2622 x 860=
23) 9221 x 293=
24) 6331 x 652=
25) 2059 x 345=
26) 5317 x 486=
27) 1045 x 835=
28) 9520 x 311=
29) 1428 x 428=
30) 6897 x 807=
31) 9029 x 826=
32) 9152 x 926=
33) 6635 x 494=
34) 5410 x 858=
35) 4506 x 144=
36) 4182 x 395=
37) 1441 x 234=
38) 5717 x 873=
39) 9491 x 820=
40) 8748 x 544=
41) 1087 x 460=
42) 3544 x 344=
43) 5424 x 902=
44) 5103 x 499=
45) 1112 x 288=
46) 3926 x 275=
47) 6809 x 438=
48) 3651 x 322=
49) 1978 x 120=
50) 8980 x 972=




Answers

1) 3913 * 684 = 2676492 2) 4800 * 358 = 1718400 3) 4044 * 926 = 3744744 4) 9320 * 228 = 2124960 5) 8364 * 191 = 1597524 6) 6691 * 279 = 1866789 7) 6663 * 587 = 3911181 8) 6804 * 864 = 5878656 9) 8803 * 944 = 8310032 10) 7528 * 591 = 4449048 11) 3500 * 139 = 486500 12) 3304 * 770 = 2544080 13) 3098 * 285 = 882930 14) 8620 * 186 = 1603320 15) 7451 * 628 = 4679228 16) 7028 * 171 = 1201788 17) 9614 * 589 = 5662646 18) 1027 * 815 = 837005 19) 6744 * 583 = 3931752 20) 3435 * 908 = 3118980 21) 9213 * 325 = 2994225 22) 2622 * 860 = 2254920 23) 9221 * 293 = 2701753 24) 6331 * 652 = 4127812 25) 2059 * 345 = 710355 26) 5317 * 486 = 2584062 27) 1045 * 835 = 872575 28) 9520 * 311 = 2960720 29) 1428 * 428 = 611184 30) 6897 * 807 = 5565879 31) 9029 * 826 = 7457954 32) 9152 * 926 = 8474752 33) 6635 * 494 = 3277690 34) 5410 * 858 = 4641780 35) 4506 * 144 = 648864 36) 4182 * 395 = 1651890 37) 1441 * 234 = 337194 38) 5717 * 873 = 4990941 39) 9491 * 820 = 7782620 40) 8748 * 544 = 4758912 41) 1087 * 460 = 500020 42) 3544 * 344 = 1219136 43) 5424 * 902 = 4892448 44) 5103 * 499 = 2546397 45) 1112 * 288 = 320256 46) 3926 * 275 = 1079650 47) 6809 * 438 = 2982342 48) 3651 * 322 = 1175622 49) 1978 * 120 = 237360 50) 8980 * 972 = 8728560

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 24

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 24

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets