JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 25

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 25

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 25, 2020.

Questions

1) 3558 x 887=
2) 3214 x 482=
3) 3474 x 821=
4) 4248 x 317=
5) 5363 x 591=
6) 9365 x 547=
7) 7339 x 468=
8) 7433 x 407=
9) 6132 x 296=
10) 7559 x 152=
11) 7961 x 556=
12) 6508 x 148=
13) 6268 x 682=
14) 5973 x 916=
15) 3755 x 483=
16) 4173 x 897=
17) 2380 x 390=
18) 3498 x 379=
19) 9444 x 932=
20) 7325 x 126=
21) 5301 x 504=
22) 3787 x 194=
23) 3031 x 414=
24) 8795 x 491=
25) 1318 x 927=
26) 1769 x 914=
27) 4365 x 621=
28) 7971 x 857=
29) 8338 x 186=
30) 1847 x 809=
31) 2315 x 682=
32) 5545 x 377=
33) 6802 x 550=
34) 7632 x 633=
35) 7973 x 390=
36) 2362 x 265=
37) 7741 x 763=
38) 8391 x 106=
39) 2657 x 697=
40) 7208 x 640=
41) 7395 x 836=
42) 3135 x 797=
43) 9798 x 361=
44) 2092 x 512=
45) 2192 x 634=
46) 1127 x 797=
47) 6102 x 127=
48) 6775 x 641=
49) 1854 x 438=
50) 2326 x 823=




Answers

1) 3558 * 887 = 3155946 2) 3214 * 482 = 1549148 3) 3474 * 821 = 2852154 4) 4248 * 317 = 1346616 5) 5363 * 591 = 3169533 6) 9365 * 547 = 5122655 7) 7339 * 468 = 3434652 8) 7433 * 407 = 3025231 9) 6132 * 296 = 1815072 10) 7559 * 152 = 1148968 11) 7961 * 556 = 4426316 12) 6508 * 148 = 963184 13) 6268 * 682 = 4274776 14) 5973 * 916 = 5471268 15) 3755 * 483 = 1813665 16) 4173 * 897 = 3743181 17) 2380 * 390 = 928200 18) 3498 * 379 = 1325742 19) 9444 * 932 = 8801808 20) 7325 * 126 = 922950 21) 5301 * 504 = 2671704 22) 3787 * 194 = 734678 23) 3031 * 414 = 1254834 24) 8795 * 491 = 4318345 25) 1318 * 927 = 1221786 26) 1769 * 914 = 1616866 27) 4365 * 621 = 2710665 28) 7971 * 857 = 6831147 29) 8338 * 186 = 1550868 30) 1847 * 809 = 1494223 31) 2315 * 682 = 1578830 32) 5545 * 377 = 2090465 33) 6802 * 550 = 3741100 34) 7632 * 633 = 4831056 35) 7973 * 390 = 3109470 36) 2362 * 265 = 625930 37) 7741 * 763 = 5906383 38) 8391 * 106 = 889446 39) 2657 * 697 = 1851929 40) 7208 * 640 = 4613120 41) 7395 * 836 = 6182220 42) 3135 * 797 = 2498595 43) 9798 * 361 = 3537078 44) 2092 * 512 = 1071104 45) 2192 * 634 = 1389728 46) 1127 * 797 = 898219 47) 6102 * 127 = 774954 48) 6775 * 641 = 4342775 49) 1854 * 438 = 812052 50) 2326 * 823 = 1914298

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 25

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 25

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets