JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 26

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 26

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 26, 2020.

Questions

1) 2752 x 207=
2) 4214 x 785=
3) 4845 x 637=
4) 5321 x 857=
5) 6191 x 850=
6) 4260 x 783=
7) 4290 x 341=
8) 4629 x 788=
9) 2044 x 503=
10) 9764 x 140=
11) 9130 x 498=
12) 9843 x 835=
13) 6297 x 355=
14) 1595 x 791=
15) 9395 x 827=
16) 7972 x 828=
17) 5771 x 456=
18) 2559 x 253=
19) 8761 x 330=
20) 5879 x 336=
21) 5522 x 357=
22) 9123 x 611=
23) 1985 x 560=
24) 6556 x 595=
25) 5255 x 853=
26) 7410 x 800=
27) 3648 x 637=
28) 9053 x 730=
29) 7293 x 318=
30) 8804 x 851=
31) 7911 x 568=
32) 4747 x 770=
33) 8309 x 714=
34) 1563 x 572=
35) 1467 x 126=
36) 5847 x 279=
37) 8185 x 530=
38) 9948 x 396=
39) 2330 x 392=
40) 6312 x 915=
41) 4092 x 369=
42) 8587 x 358=
43) 2239 x 466=
44) 3188 x 280=
45) 6715 x 873=
46) 9418 x 568=
47) 8852 x 687=
48) 8981 x 239=
49) 6433 x 976=
50) 8831 x 140=




Answers

1) 2752 * 207 = 569664 2) 4214 * 785 = 3307990 3) 4845 * 637 = 3086265 4) 5321 * 857 = 4560097 5) 6191 * 850 = 5262350 6) 4260 * 783 = 3335580 7) 4290 * 341 = 1462890 8) 4629 * 788 = 3647652 9) 2044 * 503 = 1028132 10) 9764 * 140 = 1366960 11) 9130 * 498 = 4546740 12) 9843 * 835 = 8218905 13) 6297 * 355 = 2235435 14) 1595 * 791 = 1261645 15) 9395 * 827 = 7769665 16) 7972 * 828 = 6600816 17) 5771 * 456 = 2631576 18) 2559 * 253 = 647427 19) 8761 * 330 = 2891130 20) 5879 * 336 = 1975344 21) 5522 * 357 = 1971354 22) 9123 * 611 = 5574153 23) 1985 * 560 = 1111600 24) 6556 * 595 = 3900820 25) 5255 * 853 = 4482515 26) 7410 * 800 = 5928000 27) 3648 * 637 = 2323776 28) 9053 * 730 = 6608690 29) 7293 * 318 = 2319174 30) 8804 * 851 = 7492204 31) 7911 * 568 = 4493448 32) 4747 * 770 = 3655190 33) 8309 * 714 = 5932626 34) 1563 * 572 = 894036 35) 1467 * 126 = 184842 36) 5847 * 279 = 1631313 37) 8185 * 530 = 4338050 38) 9948 * 396 = 3939408 39) 2330 * 392 = 913360 40) 6312 * 915 = 5775480 41) 4092 * 369 = 1509948 42) 8587 * 358 = 3074146 43) 2239 * 466 = 1043374 44) 3188 * 280 = 892640 45) 6715 * 873 = 5862195 46) 9418 * 568 = 5349424 47) 8852 * 687 = 6081324 48) 8981 * 239 = 2146459 49) 6433 * 976 = 6278608 50) 8831 * 140 = 1236340

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 26

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 26

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets