JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 27

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 27

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 27, 2020.

Questions

1) 8526 x 114=
2) 6414 x 726=
3) 5350 x 903=
4) 3838 x 183=
5) 6205 x 178=
6) 2302 x 622=
7) 1305 x 576=
8) 7757 x 636=
9) 4342 x 542=
10) 5969 x 424=
11) 7540 x 358=
12) 8970 x 198=
13) 3911 x 247=
14) 2622 x 869=
15) 2287 x 550=
16) 9585 x 577=
17) 3521 x 914=
18) 5174 x 615=
19) 8586 x 632=
20) 1244 x 399=
21) 9279 x 903=
22) 6322 x 874=
23) 4074 x 388=
24) 8964 x 674=
25) 7861 x 819=
26) 1409 x 327=
27) 4424 x 218=
28) 4961 x 494=
29) 7249 x 455=
30) 4532 x 546=
31) 3341 x 558=
32) 5843 x 247=
33) 9624 x 496=
34) 2632 x 348=
35) 3927 x 249=
36) 3895 x 897=
37) 9884 x 272=
38) 6864 x 296=
39) 7428 x 507=
40) 5650 x 944=
41) 8907 x 529=
42) 9976 x 923=
43) 7315 x 195=
44) 1459 x 486=
45) 6835 x 993=
46) 5822 x 195=
47) 4446 x 537=
48) 3327 x 499=
49) 8864 x 651=
50) 3465 x 599=




Answers

1) 8526 * 114 = 971964 2) 6414 * 726 = 4656564 3) 5350 * 903 = 4831050 4) 3838 * 183 = 702354 5) 6205 * 178 = 1104490 6) 2302 * 622 = 1431844 7) 1305 * 576 = 751680 8) 7757 * 636 = 4933452 9) 4342 * 542 = 2353364 10) 5969 * 424 = 2530856 11) 7540 * 358 = 2699320 12) 8970 * 198 = 1776060 13) 3911 * 247 = 966017 14) 2622 * 869 = 2278518 15) 2287 * 550 = 1257850 16) 9585 * 577 = 5530545 17) 3521 * 914 = 3218194 18) 5174 * 615 = 3182010 19) 8586 * 632 = 5426352 20) 1244 * 399 = 496356 21) 9279 * 903 = 8378937 22) 6322 * 874 = 5525428 23) 4074 * 388 = 1580712 24) 8964 * 674 = 6041736 25) 7861 * 819 = 6438159 26) 1409 * 327 = 460743 27) 4424 * 218 = 964432 28) 4961 * 494 = 2450734 29) 7249 * 455 = 3298295 30) 4532 * 546 = 2474472 31) 3341 * 558 = 1864278 32) 5843 * 247 = 1443221 33) 9624 * 496 = 4773504 34) 2632 * 348 = 915936 35) 3927 * 249 = 977823 36) 3895 * 897 = 3493815 37) 9884 * 272 = 2688448 38) 6864 * 296 = 2031744 39) 7428 * 507 = 3765996 40) 5650 * 944 = 5333600 41) 8907 * 529 = 4711803 42) 9976 * 923 = 9207848 43) 7315 * 195 = 1426425 44) 1459 * 486 = 709074 45) 6835 * 993 = 6787155 46) 5822 * 195 = 1135290 47) 4446 * 537 = 2387502 48) 3327 * 499 = 1660173 49) 8864 * 651 = 5770464 50) 3465 * 599 = 2075535

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 27

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 27

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets