JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 28

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 28

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 28, 2020.

Questions

1) 2606 x 837=
2) 3765 x 572=
3) 9132 x 630=
4) 6286 x 324=
5) 7223 x 292=
6) 4172 x 524=
7) 6803 x 398=
8) 9853 x 345=
9) 4456 x 814=
10) 8230 x 135=
11) 4093 x 114=
12) 7162 x 526=
13) 8676 x 328=
14) 2552 x 717=
15) 8286 x 616=
16) 5319 x 252=
17) 2013 x 683=
18) 3940 x 780=
19) 5447 x 558=
20) 1164 x 497=
21) 9207 x 946=
22) 8870 x 897=
23) 5847 x 609=
24) 6697 x 817=
25) 8725 x 382=
26) 5532 x 219=
27) 5652 x 972=
28) 6347 x 874=
29) 4235 x 490=
30) 3524 x 604=
31) 8554 x 840=
32) 6588 x 922=
33) 4818 x 887=
34) 3080 x 686=
35) 9664 x 997=
36) 6961 x 857=
37) 7878 x 409=
38) 1983 x 332=
39) 8755 x 916=
40) 2385 x 428=
41) 5313 x 240=
42) 2187 x 452=
43) 5365 x 802=
44) 7120 x 981=
45) 1636 x 555=
46) 2326 x 926=
47) 4339 x 873=
48) 4825 x 430=
49) 8801 x 378=
50) 5314 x 481=




Answers

1) 2606 * 837 = 2181222 2) 3765 * 572 = 2153580 3) 9132 * 630 = 5753160 4) 6286 * 324 = 2036664 5) 7223 * 292 = 2109116 6) 4172 * 524 = 2186128 7) 6803 * 398 = 2707594 8) 9853 * 345 = 3399285 9) 4456 * 814 = 3627184 10) 8230 * 135 = 1111050 11) 4093 * 114 = 466602 12) 7162 * 526 = 3767212 13) 8676 * 328 = 2845728 14) 2552 * 717 = 1829784 15) 8286 * 616 = 5104176 16) 5319 * 252 = 1340388 17) 2013 * 683 = 1374879 18) 3940 * 780 = 3073200 19) 5447 * 558 = 3039426 20) 1164 * 497 = 578508 21) 9207 * 946 = 8709822 22) 8870 * 897 = 7956390 23) 5847 * 609 = 3560823 24) 6697 * 817 = 5471449 25) 8725 * 382 = 3332950 26) 5532 * 219 = 1211508 27) 5652 * 972 = 5493744 28) 6347 * 874 = 5547278 29) 4235 * 490 = 2075150 30) 3524 * 604 = 2128496 31) 8554 * 840 = 7185360 32) 6588 * 922 = 6074136 33) 4818 * 887 = 4273566 34) 3080 * 686 = 2112880 35) 9664 * 997 = 9635008 36) 6961 * 857 = 5965577 37) 7878 * 409 = 3222102 38) 1983 * 332 = 658356 39) 8755 * 916 = 8019580 40) 2385 * 428 = 1020780 41) 5313 * 240 = 1275120 42) 2187 * 452 = 988524 43) 5365 * 802 = 4302730 44) 7120 * 981 = 6984720 45) 1636 * 555 = 907980 46) 2326 * 926 = 2153876 47) 4339 * 873 = 3787947 48) 4825 * 430 = 2074750 49) 8801 * 378 = 3326778 50) 5314 * 481 = 2556034

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 28

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 28

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets