JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 29

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 29

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 29, 2020.

Questions

1) 7870 x 111=
2) 6578 x 819=
3) 9966 x 703=
4) 8396 x 629=
5) 6941 x 730=
6) 2046 x 783=
7) 2095 x 625=
8) 4907 x 493=
9) 6144 x 888=
10) 5109 x 504=
11) 9624 x 530=
12) 8975 x 183=
13) 9122 x 350=
14) 1306 x 933=
15) 9251 x 623=
16) 1460 x 839=
17) 3455 x 323=
18) 9121 x 181=
19) 8938 x 851=
20) 4765 x 870=
21) 5598 x 124=
22) 5277 x 911=
23) 3779 x 708=
24) 9105 x 238=
25) 5792 x 257=
26) 4368 x 560=
27) 9660 x 498=
28) 9334 x 318=
29) 1622 x 524=
30) 4102 x 345=
31) 2121 x 159=
32) 6767 x 841=
33) 6545 x 149=
34) 1676 x 941=
35) 2980 x 603=
36) 2235 x 937=
37) 9250 x 488=
38) 4996 x 889=
39) 8166 x 350=
40) 3492 x 972=
41) 2823 x 634=
42) 3680 x 155=
43) 3053 x 324=
44) 7702 x 282=
45) 4919 x 382=
46) 9384 x 270=
47) 6825 x 329=
48) 9188 x 742=
49) 5501 x 379=
50) 2810 x 992=




Answers

1) 7870 * 111 = 873570 2) 6578 * 819 = 5387382 3) 9966 * 703 = 7006098 4) 8396 * 629 = 5281084 5) 6941 * 730 = 5066930 6) 2046 * 783 = 1602018 7) 2095 * 625 = 1309375 8) 4907 * 493 = 2419151 9) 6144 * 888 = 5455872 10) 5109 * 504 = 2574936 11) 9624 * 530 = 5100720 12) 8975 * 183 = 1642425 13) 9122 * 350 = 3192700 14) 1306 * 933 = 1218498 15) 9251 * 623 = 5763373 16) 1460 * 839 = 1224940 17) 3455 * 323 = 1115965 18) 9121 * 181 = 1650901 19) 8938 * 851 = 7606238 20) 4765 * 870 = 4145550 21) 5598 * 124 = 694152 22) 5277 * 911 = 4807347 23) 3779 * 708 = 2675532 24) 9105 * 238 = 2166990 25) 5792 * 257 = 1488544 26) 4368 * 560 = 2446080 27) 9660 * 498 = 4810680 28) 9334 * 318 = 2968212 29) 1622 * 524 = 849928 30) 4102 * 345 = 1415190 31) 2121 * 159 = 337239 32) 6767 * 841 = 5691047 33) 6545 * 149 = 975205 34) 1676 * 941 = 1577116 35) 2980 * 603 = 1796940 36) 2235 * 937 = 2094195 37) 9250 * 488 = 4514000 38) 4996 * 889 = 4441444 39) 8166 * 350 = 2858100 40) 3492 * 972 = 3394224 41) 2823 * 634 = 1789782 42) 3680 * 155 = 570400 43) 3053 * 324 = 989172 44) 7702 * 282 = 2171964 45) 4919 * 382 = 1879058 46) 9384 * 270 = 2533680 47) 6825 * 329 = 2245425 48) 9188 * 742 = 6817496 49) 5501 * 379 = 2084879 50) 2810 * 992 = 2787520

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 29

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 29

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets