JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 3

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 3

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 3, 2020.

Questions

1) 9868 x 838=
2) 7233 x 109=
3) 2122 x 599=
4) 8907 x 476=
5) 3186 x 509=
6) 9312 x 957=
7) 9925 x 806=
8) 2933 x 790=
9) 7992 x 817=
10) 3409 x 444=
11) 3316 x 816=
12) 1746 x 266=
13) 2126 x 141=
14) 3393 x 847=
15) 3646 x 205=
16) 8369 x 785=
17) 2456 x 564=
18) 8101 x 218=
19) 1889 x 289=
20) 7036 x 750=
21) 9329 x 152=
22) 6900 x 619=
23) 3380 x 989=
24) 4675 x 164=
25) 8845 x 419=
26) 6837 x 633=
27) 8230 x 252=
28) 6765 x 587=
29) 5127 x 757=
30) 1579 x 274=
31) 3118 x 141=
32) 1356 x 915=
33) 5814 x 329=
34) 8251 x 176=
35) 6824 x 195=
36) 9687 x 556=
37) 2964 x 279=
38) 4543 x 121=
39) 2754 x 918=
40) 4620 x 291=
41) 5310 x 421=
42) 7448 x 124=
43) 9126 x 729=
44) 1192 x 765=
45) 8578 x 682=
46) 1833 x 490=
47) 7926 x 607=
48) 2087 x 388=
49) 2921 x 658=
50) 7368 x 331=




Answers

1) 9868 * 838 = 8269384 2) 7233 * 109 = 788397 3) 2122 * 599 = 1271078 4) 8907 * 476 = 4239732 5) 3186 * 509 = 1621674 6) 9312 * 957 = 8911584 7) 9925 * 806 = 7999550 8) 2933 * 790 = 2317070 9) 7992 * 817 = 6529464 10) 3409 * 444 = 1513596 11) 3316 * 816 = 2705856 12) 1746 * 266 = 464436 13) 2126 * 141 = 299766 14) 3393 * 847 = 2873871 15) 3646 * 205 = 747430 16) 8369 * 785 = 6569665 17) 2456 * 564 = 1385184 18) 8101 * 218 = 1766018 19) 1889 * 289 = 545921 20) 7036 * 750 = 5277000 21) 9329 * 152 = 1418008 22) 6900 * 619 = 4271100 23) 3380 * 989 = 3342820 24) 4675 * 164 = 766700 25) 8845 * 419 = 3706055 26) 6837 * 633 = 4327821 27) 8230 * 252 = 2073960 28) 6765 * 587 = 3971055 29) 5127 * 757 = 3881139 30) 1579 * 274 = 432646 31) 3118 * 141 = 439638 32) 1356 * 915 = 1240740 33) 5814 * 329 = 1912806 34) 8251 * 176 = 1452176 35) 6824 * 195 = 1330680 36) 9687 * 556 = 5385972 37) 2964 * 279 = 826956 38) 4543 * 121 = 549703 39) 2754 * 918 = 2528172 40) 4620 * 291 = 1344420 41) 5310 * 421 = 2235510 42) 7448 * 124 = 923552 43) 9126 * 729 = 6652854 44) 1192 * 765 = 911880 45) 8578 * 682 = 5850196 46) 1833 * 490 = 898170 47) 7926 * 607 = 4811082 48) 2087 * 388 = 809756 49) 2921 * 658 = 1922018 50) 7368 * 331 = 2438808

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 3

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 3

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets