JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 30

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 30

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 30, 2020.

Questions

1) 7495 x 934=
2) 6831 x 886=
3) 4445 x 146=
4) 9847 x 133=
5) 3042 x 158=
6) 9634 x 167=
7) 9093 x 193=
8) 9032 x 443=
9) 2224 x 773=
10) 4822 x 132=
11) 3146 x 189=
12) 4703 x 279=
13) 9641 x 573=
14) 7034 x 407=
15) 7886 x 614=
16) 2162 x 517=
17) 2114 x 773=
18) 9543 x 522=
19) 4237 x 545=
20) 8555 x 734=
21) 7315 x 759=
22) 6575 x 892=
23) 8234 x 322=
24) 3412 x 968=
25) 5152 x 355=
26) 6280 x 600=
27) 5767 x 482=
28) 1971 x 577=
29) 7198 x 506=
30) 1169 x 278=
31) 2689 x 295=
32) 7715 x 719=
33) 6016 x 657=
34) 3896 x 486=
35) 1682 x 188=
36) 2382 x 907=
37) 1722 x 746=
38) 2128 x 204=
39) 9654 x 839=
40) 7072 x 642=
41) 7207 x 979=
42) 8785 x 255=
43) 8189 x 397=
44) 8001 x 336=
45) 3548 x 102=
46) 6301 x 994=
47) 3170 x 781=
48) 6466 x 953=
49) 8234 x 297=
50) 1139 x 570=




Answers

1) 7495 * 934 = 7000330 2) 6831 * 886 = 6052266 3) 4445 * 146 = 648970 4) 9847 * 133 = 1309651 5) 3042 * 158 = 480636 6) 9634 * 167 = 1608878 7) 9093 * 193 = 1754949 8) 9032 * 443 = 4001176 9) 2224 * 773 = 1719152 10) 4822 * 132 = 636504 11) 3146 * 189 = 594594 12) 4703 * 279 = 1312137 13) 9641 * 573 = 5524293 14) 7034 * 407 = 2862838 15) 7886 * 614 = 4842004 16) 2162 * 517 = 1117754 17) 2114 * 773 = 1634122 18) 9543 * 522 = 4981446 19) 4237 * 545 = 2309165 20) 8555 * 734 = 6279370 21) 7315 * 759 = 5552085 22) 6575 * 892 = 5864900 23) 8234 * 322 = 2651348 24) 3412 * 968 = 3302816 25) 5152 * 355 = 1828960 26) 6280 * 600 = 3768000 27) 5767 * 482 = 2779694 28) 1971 * 577 = 1137267 29) 7198 * 506 = 3642188 30) 1169 * 278 = 324982 31) 2689 * 295 = 793255 32) 7715 * 719 = 5547085 33) 6016 * 657 = 3952512 34) 3896 * 486 = 1893456 35) 1682 * 188 = 316216 36) 2382 * 907 = 2160474 37) 1722 * 746 = 1284612 38) 2128 * 204 = 434112 39) 9654 * 839 = 8099706 40) 7072 * 642 = 4540224 41) 7207 * 979 = 7055653 42) 8785 * 255 = 2240175 43) 8189 * 397 = 3251033 44) 8001 * 336 = 2688336 45) 3548 * 102 = 361896 46) 6301 * 994 = 6263194 47) 3170 * 781 = 2475770 48) 6466 * 953 = 6162098 49) 8234 * 297 = 2445498 50) 1139 * 570 = 649230

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 30

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 30

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets