JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 31

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 31

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on October 1, 2020.

Questions

1) 3245 x 862=
2) 3777 x 298=
3) 7575 x 774=
4) 3946 x 194=
5) 7074 x 360=
6) 2451 x 534=
7) 5791 x 828=
8) 2207 x 181=
9) 4020 x 374=
10) 9142 x 300=
11) 4647 x 806=
12) 1250 x 600=
13) 5169 x 492=
14) 6102 x 683=
15) 6276 x 138=
16) 7874 x 417=
17) 5984 x 383=
18) 8586 x 454=
19) 8262 x 123=
20) 5526 x 151=
21) 6721 x 182=
22) 6209 x 349=
23) 8258 x 957=
24) 8934 x 736=
25) 9955 x 446=
26) 3264 x 741=
27) 4012 x 467=
28) 9135 x 482=
29) 2502 x 811=
30) 5826 x 584=
31) 8357 x 696=
32) 9906 x 168=
33) 5796 x 774=
34) 5193 x 672=
35) 8509 x 512=
36) 2678 x 824=
37) 1168 x 560=
38) 4342 x 870=
39) 1038 x 259=
40) 8916 x 558=
41) 8933 x 881=
42) 3175 x 130=
43) 7912 x 243=
44) 6905 x 274=
45) 5239 x 422=
46) 8854 x 588=
47) 7042 x 980=
48) 3013 x 207=
49) 8074 x 291=
50) 7813 x 418=




Answers

1) 3245 * 862 = 2797190 2) 3777 * 298 = 1125546 3) 7575 * 774 = 5863050 4) 3946 * 194 = 765524 5) 7074 * 360 = 2546640 6) 2451 * 534 = 1308834 7) 5791 * 828 = 4794948 8) 2207 * 181 = 399467 9) 4020 * 374 = 1503480 10) 9142 * 300 = 2742600 11) 4647 * 806 = 3745482 12) 1250 * 600 = 750000 13) 5169 * 492 = 2543148 14) 6102 * 683 = 4167666 15) 6276 * 138 = 866088 16) 7874 * 417 = 3283458 17) 5984 * 383 = 2291872 18) 8586 * 454 = 3898044 19) 8262 * 123 = 1016226 20) 5526 * 151 = 834426 21) 6721 * 182 = 1223222 22) 6209 * 349 = 2166941 23) 8258 * 957 = 7902906 24) 8934 * 736 = 6575424 25) 9955 * 446 = 4439930 26) 3264 * 741 = 2418624 27) 4012 * 467 = 1873604 28) 9135 * 482 = 4403070 29) 2502 * 811 = 2029122 30) 5826 * 584 = 3402384 31) 8357 * 696 = 5816472 32) 9906 * 168 = 1664208 33) 5796 * 774 = 4486104 34) 5193 * 672 = 3489696 35) 8509 * 512 = 4356608 36) 2678 * 824 = 2206672 37) 1168 * 560 = 654080 38) 4342 * 870 = 3777540 39) 1038 * 259 = 268842 40) 8916 * 558 = 4975128 41) 8933 * 881 = 7869973 42) 3175 * 130 = 412750 43) 7912 * 243 = 1922616 44) 6905 * 274 = 1891970 45) 5239 * 422 = 2210858 46) 8854 * 588 = 5206152 47) 7042 * 980 = 6901160 48) 3013 * 207 = 623691 49) 8074 * 291 = 2349534 50) 7813 * 418 = 3265834

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 31

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 31

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets