1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 32

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 32

Last updated on December 3, 2020. Created on October 2, 2020.

Questions

1) 7987 x 503=
2) 5160 x 292=
3) 4212 x 565=
4) 9369 x 581=
5) 6072 x 796=
6) 5504 x 290=
7) 3459 x 889=
8) 2644 x 901=
9) 7341 x 519=
10) 5187 x 503=
11) 1559 x 242=
12) 3233 x 333=
13) 1972 x 726=
14) 3769 x 762=
15) 6223 x 849=
16) 2591 x 394=
17) 7019 x 737=
18) 7210 x 402=
19) 3719 x 184=
20) 2268 x 890=
21) 1424 x 259=
22) 2404 x 537=
23) 4194 x 216=
24) 9212 x 555=
25) 9891 x 604=
26) 2513 x 665=
27) 3385 x 241=
28) 5752 x 611=
29) 2257 x 353=
30) 1124 x 499=
31) 2223 x 607=
32) 9640 x 953=
33) 1245 x 620=
34) 3375 x 801=
35) 2013 x 628=
36) 6282 x 486=
37) 2487 x 277=
38) 7545 x 658=
39) 3140 x 390=
40) 9366 x 160=
41) 5440 x 822=
42) 7600 x 232=
43) 3484 x 542=
44) 8322 x 528=
45) 4216 x 619=
46) 2637 x 911=
47) 7473 x 779=
48) 9013 x 403=
49) 2598 x 951=
50) 6580 x 667=




Answers

1) 7987 * 503 = 4017461 2) 5160 * 292 = 1506720 3) 4212 * 565 = 2379780 4) 9369 * 581 = 5443389 5) 6072 * 796 = 4833312 6) 5504 * 290 = 1596160 7) 3459 * 889 = 3075051 8) 2644 * 901 = 2382244 9) 7341 * 519 = 3809979 10) 5187 * 503 = 2609061 11) 1559 * 242 = 377278 12) 3233 * 333 = 1076589 13) 1972 * 726 = 1431672 14) 3769 * 762 = 2871978 15) 6223 * 849 = 5283327 16) 2591 * 394 = 1020854 17) 7019 * 737 = 5173003 18) 7210 * 402 = 2898420 19) 3719 * 184 = 684296 20) 2268 * 890 = 2018520 21) 1424 * 259 = 368816 22) 2404 * 537 = 1290948 23) 4194 * 216 = 905904 24) 9212 * 555 = 5112660 25) 9891 * 604 = 5974164 26) 2513 * 665 = 1671145 27) 3385 * 241 = 815785 28) 5752 * 611 = 3514472 29) 2257 * 353 = 796721 30) 1124 * 499 = 560876 31) 2223 * 607 = 1349361 32) 9640 * 953 = 9186920 33) 1245 * 620 = 771900 34) 3375 * 801 = 2703375 35) 2013 * 628 = 1264164 36) 6282 * 486 = 3053052 37) 2487 * 277 = 688899 38) 7545 * 658 = 4964610 39) 3140 * 390 = 1224600 40) 9366 * 160 = 1498560 41) 5440 * 822 = 4471680 42) 7600 * 232 = 1763200 43) 3484 * 542 = 1888328 44) 8322 * 528 = 4394016 45) 4216 * 619 = 2609704 46) 2637 * 911 = 2402307 47) 7473 * 779 = 5821467 48) 9013 * 403 = 3632239 49) 2598 * 951 = 2470698 50) 6580 * 667 = 4388860

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 32

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 32

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 94

Prime numbers Worksheet 94

Percent worksheets 94

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 94

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 94

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 94

Factors worksheet94

Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Ratios worksheets 93

Prime numbers Worksheet 93

Percent worksheets 93

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets