1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 33

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 33

Last updated on December 3, 2020. Created on October 3, 2020.

Questions

1) 2810 x 935=
2) 6909 x 217=
3) 5753 x 175=
4) 9250 x 225=
5) 2672 x 859=
6) 9060 x 270=
7) 9427 x 906=
8) 6857 x 144=
9) 5119 x 752=
10) 4129 x 777=
11) 8946 x 663=
12) 6191 x 269=
13) 2545 x 211=
14) 6982 x 474=
15) 1615 x 577=
16) 5252 x 671=
17) 8643 x 798=
18) 5284 x 973=
19) 3834 x 995=
20) 1253 x 329=
21) 4777 x 612=
22) 4056 x 426=
23) 4034 x 574=
24) 9522 x 491=
25) 7753 x 454=
26) 9723 x 204=
27) 2855 x 435=
28) 3850 x 196=
29) 3224 x 283=
30) 1152 x 134=
31) 9499 x 586=
32) 8500 x 351=
33) 2257 x 470=
34) 7261 x 910=
35) 2908 x 293=
36) 7468 x 230=
37) 3524 x 129=
38) 1150 x 334=
39) 3009 x 734=
40) 9772 x 179=
41) 5204 x 289=
42) 7523 x 515=
43) 6209 x 165=
44) 1917 x 805=
45) 8135 x 716=
46) 7704 x 164=
47) 5703 x 657=
48) 4107 x 419=
49) 7710 x 582=
50) 4704 x 705=




Answers

1) 2810 * 935 = 2627350 2) 6909 * 217 = 1499253 3) 5753 * 175 = 1006775 4) 9250 * 225 = 2081250 5) 2672 * 859 = 2295248 6) 9060 * 270 = 2446200 7) 9427 * 906 = 8540862 8) 6857 * 144 = 987408 9) 5119 * 752 = 3849488 10) 4129 * 777 = 3208233 11) 8946 * 663 = 5931198 12) 6191 * 269 = 1665379 13) 2545 * 211 = 536995 14) 6982 * 474 = 3309468 15) 1615 * 577 = 931855 16) 5252 * 671 = 3524092 17) 8643 * 798 = 6897114 18) 5284 * 973 = 5141332 19) 3834 * 995 = 3814830 20) 1253 * 329 = 412237 21) 4777 * 612 = 2923524 22) 4056 * 426 = 1727856 23) 4034 * 574 = 2315516 24) 9522 * 491 = 4675302 25) 7753 * 454 = 3519862 26) 9723 * 204 = 1983492 27) 2855 * 435 = 1241925 28) 3850 * 196 = 754600 29) 3224 * 283 = 912392 30) 1152 * 134 = 154368 31) 9499 * 586 = 5566414 32) 8500 * 351 = 2983500 33) 2257 * 470 = 1060790 34) 7261 * 910 = 6607510 35) 2908 * 293 = 852044 36) 7468 * 230 = 1717640 37) 3524 * 129 = 454596 38) 1150 * 334 = 384100 39) 3009 * 734 = 2208606 40) 9772 * 179 = 1749188 41) 5204 * 289 = 1503956 42) 7523 * 515 = 3874345 43) 6209 * 165 = 1024485 44) 1917 * 805 = 1543185 45) 8135 * 716 = 5824660 46) 7704 * 164 = 1263456 47) 5703 * 657 = 3746871 48) 4107 * 419 = 1720833 49) 7710 * 582 = 4487220 50) 4704 * 705 = 3316320

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 33

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 33

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 94

Prime numbers Worksheet 94

Percent worksheets 94

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 94

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 94

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 94

Factors worksheet94

Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Ratios worksheets 93

Prime numbers Worksheet 93

Percent worksheets 93

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets