1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 34

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 34

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on October 4, 2020.

Questions

1) 8137 x 206=
2) 4150 x 427=
3) 1339 x 367=
4) 1273 x 451=
5) 7158 x 136=
6) 6250 x 111=
7) 4814 x 662=
8) 9793 x 166=
9) 8745 x 896=
10) 2145 x 935=
11) 3797 x 947=
12) 1385 x 850=
13) 7327 x 901=
14) 1913 x 783=
15) 8682 x 414=
16) 1591 x 905=
17) 3944 x 469=
18) 8428 x 910=
19) 7039 x 413=
20) 2660 x 327=
21) 4788 x 445=
22) 8591 x 867=
23) 4251 x 546=
24) 6191 x 776=
25) 5489 x 752=
26) 1211 x 937=
27) 3009 x 465=
28) 9241 x 619=
29) 5957 x 818=
30) 8779 x 637=
31) 1378 x 541=
32) 7796 x 558=
33) 4977 x 202=
34) 5766 x 598=
35) 4010 x 429=
36) 5795 x 670=
37) 8773 x 814=
38) 9625 x 286=
39) 7609 x 175=
40) 6122 x 596=
41) 3150 x 865=
42) 2729 x 326=
43) 2725 x 711=
44) 9934 x 779=
45) 8050 x 106=
46) 1224 x 133=
47) 7823 x 976=
48) 2306 x 288=
49) 1092 x 366=
50) 4295 x 377=




Answers

1) 8137 * 206 = 1676222 2) 4150 * 427 = 1772050 3) 1339 * 367 = 491413 4) 1273 * 451 = 574123 5) 7158 * 136 = 973488 6) 6250 * 111 = 693750 7) 4814 * 662 = 3186868 8) 9793 * 166 = 1625638 9) 8745 * 896 = 7835520 10) 2145 * 935 = 2005575 11) 3797 * 947 = 3595759 12) 1385 * 850 = 1177250 13) 7327 * 901 = 6601627 14) 1913 * 783 = 1497879 15) 8682 * 414 = 3594348 16) 1591 * 905 = 1439855 17) 3944 * 469 = 1849736 18) 8428 * 910 = 7669480 19) 7039 * 413 = 2907107 20) 2660 * 327 = 869820 21) 4788 * 445 = 2130660 22) 8591 * 867 = 7448397 23) 4251 * 546 = 2321046 24) 6191 * 776 = 4804216 25) 5489 * 752 = 4127728 26) 1211 * 937 = 1134707 27) 3009 * 465 = 1399185 28) 9241 * 619 = 5720179 29) 5957 * 818 = 4872826 30) 8779 * 637 = 5592223 31) 1378 * 541 = 745498 32) 7796 * 558 = 4350168 33) 4977 * 202 = 1005354 34) 5766 * 598 = 3448068 35) 4010 * 429 = 1720290 36) 5795 * 670 = 3882650 37) 8773 * 814 = 7141222 38) 9625 * 286 = 2752750 39) 7609 * 175 = 1331575 40) 6122 * 596 = 3648712 41) 3150 * 865 = 2724750 42) 2729 * 326 = 889654 43) 2725 * 711 = 1937475 44) 9934 * 779 = 7738586 45) 8050 * 106 = 853300 46) 1224 * 133 = 162792 47) 7823 * 976 = 7635248 48) 2306 * 288 = 664128 49) 1092 * 366 = 399672 50) 4295 * 377 = 1619215

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 34

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 34

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 89

Prime numbers Worksheet 89

Percent worksheets 89

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 89

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 89

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 89

Factors worksheet89

Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Ratios worksheets 88

Prime numbers Worksheet 88

Percent worksheets 88

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets