1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 35

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 35

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 5, 2020.

Questions

1) 4627 x 492=
2) 7808 x 107=
3) 9585 x 219=
4) 7739 x 582=
5) 8383 x 368=
6) 3534 x 264=
7) 7108 x 778=
8) 2151 x 181=
9) 4509 x 352=
10) 7161 x 656=
11) 5083 x 714=
12) 3125 x 980=
13) 9986 x 427=
14) 9001 x 693=
15) 4240 x 272=
16) 5197 x 992=
17) 3503 x 200=
18) 1683 x 456=
19) 2307 x 417=
20) 7166 x 525=
21) 2600 x 238=
22) 8126 x 655=
23) 7774 x 859=
24) 3404 x 657=
25) 6009 x 625=
26) 8495 x 335=
27) 5548 x 147=
28) 4842 x 654=
29) 3257 x 681=
30) 4831 x 703=
31) 2485 x 150=
32) 5197 x 590=
33) 9850 x 627=
34) 5873 x 600=
35) 6598 x 405=
36) 1361 x 466=
37) 3119 x 735=
38) 5740 x 793=
39) 8546 x 454=
40) 5448 x 185=
41) 9750 x 156=
42) 9903 x 837=
43) 3299 x 416=
44) 4416 x 306=
45) 2966 x 157=
46) 7016 x 651=
47) 2801 x 457=
48) 8696 x 810=
49) 5405 x 474=
50) 6556 x 390=




Answers

1) 4627 * 492 = 2276484 2) 7808 * 107 = 835456 3) 9585 * 219 = 2099115 4) 7739 * 582 = 4504098 5) 8383 * 368 = 3084944 6) 3534 * 264 = 932976 7) 7108 * 778 = 5530024 8) 2151 * 181 = 389331 9) 4509 * 352 = 1587168 10) 7161 * 656 = 4697616 11) 5083 * 714 = 3629262 12) 3125 * 980 = 3062500 13) 9986 * 427 = 4264022 14) 9001 * 693 = 6237693 15) 4240 * 272 = 1153280 16) 5197 * 992 = 5155424 17) 3503 * 200 = 700600 18) 1683 * 456 = 767448 19) 2307 * 417 = 962019 20) 7166 * 525 = 3762150 21) 2600 * 238 = 618800 22) 8126 * 655 = 5322530 23) 7774 * 859 = 6677866 24) 3404 * 657 = 2236428 25) 6009 * 625 = 3755625 26) 8495 * 335 = 2845825 27) 5548 * 147 = 815556 28) 4842 * 654 = 3166668 29) 3257 * 681 = 2218017 30) 4831 * 703 = 3396193 31) 2485 * 150 = 372750 32) 5197 * 590 = 3066230 33) 9850 * 627 = 6175950 34) 5873 * 600 = 3523800 35) 6598 * 405 = 2672190 36) 1361 * 466 = 634226 37) 3119 * 735 = 2292465 38) 5740 * 793 = 4551820 39) 8546 * 454 = 3879884 40) 5448 * 185 = 1007880 41) 9750 * 156 = 1521000 42) 9903 * 837 = 8288811 43) 3299 * 416 = 1372384 44) 4416 * 306 = 1351296 45) 2966 * 157 = 465662 46) 7016 * 651 = 4567416 47) 2801 * 457 = 1280057 48) 8696 * 810 = 7043760 49) 5405 * 474 = 2561970 50) 6556 * 390 = 2556840

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 35

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 35

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 81

Prime numbers Worksheet 81

Percent worksheets 81

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 81

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 81

Factors worksheet81

Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Ratios worksheets 80

Prime numbers Worksheet 80

Percent worksheets 80

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets