1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 36

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 36

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 6, 2020.

Questions

1) 4323 x 645=
2) 3765 x 733=
3) 3833 x 810=
4) 3691 x 964=
5) 1025 x 820=
6) 6358 x 725=
7) 6289 x 636=
8) 7288 x 380=
9) 5905 x 742=
10) 4100 x 884=
11) 2086 x 171=
12) 5493 x 648=
13) 9512 x 980=
14) 5052 x 278=
15) 4700 x 430=
16) 3167 x 440=
17) 7569 x 474=
18) 1086 x 904=
19) 5800 x 426=
20) 4987 x 713=
21) 8122 x 144=
22) 4648 x 519=
23) 5721 x 911=
24) 1728 x 472=
25) 4955 x 213=
26) 1413 x 111=
27) 8751 x 274=
28) 3170 x 628=
29) 3348 x 250=
30) 8113 x 686=
31) 7550 x 282=
32) 3981 x 436=
33) 3657 x 386=
34) 7848 x 780=
35) 2782 x 288=
36) 2267 x 314=
37) 7064 x 838=
38) 7027 x 460=
39) 6447 x 420=
40) 5700 x 319=
41) 8283 x 355=
42) 4519 x 444=
43) 4874 x 897=
44) 4873 x 622=
45) 9279 x 638=
46) 1868 x 637=
47) 6592 x 782=
48) 5796 x 537=
49) 7041 x 234=
50) 7076 x 255=




Answers

1) 4323 * 645 = 2788335 2) 3765 * 733 = 2759745 3) 3833 * 810 = 3104730 4) 3691 * 964 = 3558124 5) 1025 * 820 = 840500 6) 6358 * 725 = 4609550 7) 6289 * 636 = 3999804 8) 7288 * 380 = 2769440 9) 5905 * 742 = 4381510 10) 4100 * 884 = 3624400 11) 2086 * 171 = 356706 12) 5493 * 648 = 3559464 13) 9512 * 980 = 9321760 14) 5052 * 278 = 1404456 15) 4700 * 430 = 2021000 16) 3167 * 440 = 1393480 17) 7569 * 474 = 3587706 18) 1086 * 904 = 981744 19) 5800 * 426 = 2470800 20) 4987 * 713 = 3555731 21) 8122 * 144 = 1169568 22) 4648 * 519 = 2412312 23) 5721 * 911 = 5211831 24) 1728 * 472 = 815616 25) 4955 * 213 = 1055415 26) 1413 * 111 = 156843 27) 8751 * 274 = 2397774 28) 3170 * 628 = 1990760 29) 3348 * 250 = 837000 30) 8113 * 686 = 5565518 31) 7550 * 282 = 2129100 32) 3981 * 436 = 1735716 33) 3657 * 386 = 1411602 34) 7848 * 780 = 6121440 35) 2782 * 288 = 801216 36) 2267 * 314 = 711838 37) 7064 * 838 = 5919632 38) 7027 * 460 = 3232420 39) 6447 * 420 = 2707740 40) 5700 * 319 = 1818300 41) 8283 * 355 = 2940465 42) 4519 * 444 = 2006436 43) 4874 * 897 = 4371978 44) 4873 * 622 = 3031006 45) 9279 * 638 = 5920002 46) 1868 * 637 = 1189916 47) 6592 * 782 = 5154944 48) 5796 * 537 = 3112452 49) 7041 * 234 = 1647594 50) 7076 * 255 = 1804380

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 36

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 36

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 81

Prime numbers Worksheet 81

Percent worksheets 81

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 81

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 81

Factors worksheet81

Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Ratios worksheets 80

Prime numbers Worksheet 80

Percent worksheets 80

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets