1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 38

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 38

Last updated on December 3, 2020. Created on October 8, 2020.

Questions

1) 8116 x 779=
2) 5069 x 810=
3) 9276 x 274=
4) 2288 x 757=
5) 3890 x 416=
6) 4031 x 460=
7) 8281 x 370=
8) 7486 x 383=
9) 5904 x 337=
10) 6719 x 150=
11) 1499 x 310=
12) 7627 x 649=
13) 8203 x 330=
14) 8777 x 770=
15) 4954 x 337=
16) 6207 x 477=
17) 4199 x 221=
18) 9673 x 827=
19) 2608 x 600=
20) 7501 x 879=
21) 3435 x 690=
22) 7638 x 271=
23) 9988 x 333=
24) 5326 x 696=
25) 1200 x 775=
26) 8947 x 292=
27) 8737 x 291=
28) 6454 x 438=
29) 6200 x 476=
30) 5973 x 532=
31) 3527 x 570=
32) 8900 x 525=
33) 4460 x 130=
34) 2136 x 376=
35) 9875 x 607=
36) 5155 x 346=
37) 9748 x 515=
38) 6414 x 909=
39) 2033 x 185=
40) 3814 x 927=
41) 1462 x 410=
42) 9573 x 193=
43) 7314 x 995=
44) 1682 x 726=
45) 9514 x 225=
46) 7807 x 149=
47) 7986 x 120=
48) 7074 x 252=
49) 5459 x 252=
50) 3597 x 812=




Answers

1) 8116 * 779 = 6322364 2) 5069 * 810 = 4105890 3) 9276 * 274 = 2541624 4) 2288 * 757 = 1732016 5) 3890 * 416 = 1618240 6) 4031 * 460 = 1854260 7) 8281 * 370 = 3063970 8) 7486 * 383 = 2867138 9) 5904 * 337 = 1989648 10) 6719 * 150 = 1007850 11) 1499 * 310 = 464690 12) 7627 * 649 = 4949923 13) 8203 * 330 = 2706990 14) 8777 * 770 = 6758290 15) 4954 * 337 = 1669498 16) 6207 * 477 = 2960739 17) 4199 * 221 = 927979 18) 9673 * 827 = 7999571 19) 2608 * 600 = 1564800 20) 7501 * 879 = 6593379 21) 3435 * 690 = 2370150 22) 7638 * 271 = 2069898 23) 9988 * 333 = 3326004 24) 5326 * 696 = 3706896 25) 1200 * 775 = 930000 26) 8947 * 292 = 2612524 27) 8737 * 291 = 2542467 28) 6454 * 438 = 2826852 29) 6200 * 476 = 2951200 30) 5973 * 532 = 3177636 31) 3527 * 570 = 2010390 32) 8900 * 525 = 4672500 33) 4460 * 130 = 579800 34) 2136 * 376 = 803136 35) 9875 * 607 = 5994125 36) 5155 * 346 = 1783630 37) 9748 * 515 = 5020220 38) 6414 * 909 = 5830326 39) 2033 * 185 = 376105 40) 3814 * 927 = 3535578 41) 1462 * 410 = 599420 42) 9573 * 193 = 1847589 43) 7314 * 995 = 7277430 44) 1682 * 726 = 1221132 45) 9514 * 225 = 2140650 46) 7807 * 149 = 1163243 47) 7986 * 120 = 958320 48) 7074 * 252 = 1782648 49) 5459 * 252 = 1375668 50) 3597 * 812 = 2920764

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 38

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 38

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 94

Prime numbers Worksheet 94

Percent worksheets 94

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 94

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 94

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 94

Factors worksheet94

Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Ratios worksheets 93

Prime numbers Worksheet 93

Percent worksheets 93

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets