1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 39

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 39

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on October 9, 2020.

Questions

1) 9673 x 258=
2) 9068 x 681=
3) 4792 x 641=
4) 1071 x 541=
5) 6749 x 273=
6) 4691 x 506=
7) 2784 x 243=
8) 2206 x 543=
9) 9659 x 361=
10) 7748 x 647=
11) 3784 x 606=
12) 9704 x 377=
13) 6448 x 563=
14) 5737 x 644=
15) 6098 x 716=
16) 9567 x 898=
17) 4348 x 569=
18) 8428 x 784=
19) 6378 x 992=
20) 4554 x 635=
21) 6601 x 948=
22) 8426 x 456=
23) 9037 x 211=
24) 9598 x 228=
25) 2324 x 198=
26) 9534 x 996=
27) 7461 x 795=
28) 4156 x 214=
29) 9634 x 384=
30) 4920 x 549=
31) 1751 x 480=
32) 2066 x 202=
33) 4120 x 484=
34) 8235 x 788=
35) 7612 x 757=
36) 9349 x 446=
37) 9623 x 541=
38) 3552 x 487=
39) 6597 x 841=
40) 5733 x 939=
41) 3963 x 297=
42) 9508 x 597=
43) 4420 x 908=
44) 3913 x 364=
45) 1109 x 558=
46) 4573 x 682=
47) 6054 x 443=
48) 9751 x 636=
49) 3819 x 710=
50) 7531 x 360=




Answers

1) 9673 * 258 = 2495634 2) 9068 * 681 = 6175308 3) 4792 * 641 = 3071672 4) 1071 * 541 = 579411 5) 6749 * 273 = 1842477 6) 4691 * 506 = 2373646 7) 2784 * 243 = 676512 8) 2206 * 543 = 1197858 9) 9659 * 361 = 3486899 10) 7748 * 647 = 5012956 11) 3784 * 606 = 2293104 12) 9704 * 377 = 3658408 13) 6448 * 563 = 3630224 14) 5737 * 644 = 3694628 15) 6098 * 716 = 4366168 16) 9567 * 898 = 8591166 17) 4348 * 569 = 2474012 18) 8428 * 784 = 6607552 19) 6378 * 992 = 6326976 20) 4554 * 635 = 2891790 21) 6601 * 948 = 6257748 22) 8426 * 456 = 3842256 23) 9037 * 211 = 1906807 24) 9598 * 228 = 2188344 25) 2324 * 198 = 460152 26) 9534 * 996 = 9495864 27) 7461 * 795 = 5931495 28) 4156 * 214 = 889384 29) 9634 * 384 = 3699456 30) 4920 * 549 = 2701080 31) 1751 * 480 = 840480 32) 2066 * 202 = 417332 33) 4120 * 484 = 1994080 34) 8235 * 788 = 6489180 35) 7612 * 757 = 5762284 36) 9349 * 446 = 4169654 37) 9623 * 541 = 5206043 38) 3552 * 487 = 1729824 39) 6597 * 841 = 5548077 40) 5733 * 939 = 5383287 41) 3963 * 297 = 1177011 42) 9508 * 597 = 5676276 43) 4420 * 908 = 4013360 44) 3913 * 364 = 1424332 45) 1109 * 558 = 618822 46) 4573 * 682 = 3118786 47) 6054 * 443 = 2681922 48) 9751 * 636 = 6201636 49) 3819 * 710 = 2711490 50) 7531 * 360 = 2711160

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 39

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 39

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 91

Prime numbers Worksheet 91

Percent worksheets 91

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 91

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 91

Factors worksheet91

Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Ratios worksheets 90

Prime numbers Worksheet 90

Percent worksheets 90

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets