JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 4

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 4

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 4, 2020.

Questions

1) 4876 x 291=
2) 9477 x 283=
3) 4335 x 625=
4) 7565 x 630=
5) 4066 x 624=
6) 1635 x 457=
7) 4314 x 387=
8) 3953 x 188=
9) 6226 x 396=
10) 9781 x 254=
11) 7221 x 900=
12) 5638 x 930=
13) 4610 x 108=
14) 8877 x 288=
15) 2422 x 221=
16) 1408 x 328=
17) 4527 x 333=
18) 6652 x 364=
19) 8109 x 263=
20) 9257 x 144=
21) 2400 x 261=
22) 9418 x 224=
23) 2831 x 274=
24) 3440 x 944=
25) 7572 x 622=
26) 1317 x 696=
27) 7447 x 847=
28) 8146 x 937=
29) 5845 x 516=
30) 8776 x 872=
31) 5973 x 495=
32) 5072 x 111=
33) 5774 x 722=
34) 3808 x 754=
35) 8053 x 647=
36) 8430 x 573=
37) 1002 x 625=
38) 4940 x 949=
39) 6058 x 158=
40) 1066 x 493=
41) 4717 x 237=
42) 4709 x 636=
43) 9001 x 224=
44) 2366 x 348=
45) 4397 x 318=
46) 4509 x 448=
47) 4034 x 234=
48) 8477 x 929=
49) 4656 x 231=
50) 9884 x 376=




Answers

1) 4876 * 291 = 1418916 2) 9477 * 283 = 2681991 3) 4335 * 625 = 2709375 4) 7565 * 630 = 4765950 5) 4066 * 624 = 2537184 6) 1635 * 457 = 747195 7) 4314 * 387 = 1669518 8) 3953 * 188 = 743164 9) 6226 * 396 = 2465496 10) 9781 * 254 = 2484374 11) 7221 * 900 = 6498900 12) 5638 * 930 = 5243340 13) 4610 * 108 = 497880 14) 8877 * 288 = 2556576 15) 2422 * 221 = 535262 16) 1408 * 328 = 461824 17) 4527 * 333 = 1507491 18) 6652 * 364 = 2421328 19) 8109 * 263 = 2132667 20) 9257 * 144 = 1333008 21) 2400 * 261 = 626400 22) 9418 * 224 = 2109632 23) 2831 * 274 = 775694 24) 3440 * 944 = 3247360 25) 7572 * 622 = 4709784 26) 1317 * 696 = 916632 27) 7447 * 847 = 6307609 28) 8146 * 937 = 7632802 29) 5845 * 516 = 3016020 30) 8776 * 872 = 7652672 31) 5973 * 495 = 2956635 32) 5072 * 111 = 562992 33) 5774 * 722 = 4168828 34) 3808 * 754 = 2871232 35) 8053 * 647 = 5210291 36) 8430 * 573 = 4830390 37) 1002 * 625 = 626250 38) 4940 * 949 = 4688060 39) 6058 * 158 = 957164 40) 1066 * 493 = 525538 41) 4717 * 237 = 1117929 42) 4709 * 636 = 2994924 43) 9001 * 224 = 2016224 44) 2366 * 348 = 823368 45) 4397 * 318 = 1398246 46) 4509 * 448 = 2020032 47) 4034 * 234 = 943956 48) 8477 * 929 = 7875133 49) 4656 * 231 = 1075536 50) 9884 * 376 = 3716384

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 4

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 4

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets