1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 40

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 40

Last updated on December 3, 2020. Created on October 10, 2020.

Questions

1) 7768 x 959=
2) 6236 x 173=
3) 1610 x 849=
4) 9251 x 306=
5) 6546 x 886=
6) 6448 x 661=
7) 1108 x 553=
8) 4159 x 836=
9) 7321 x 502=
10) 8597 x 619=
11) 6242 x 567=
12) 2530 x 245=
13) 2078 x 965=
14) 9984 x 469=
15) 2007 x 348=
16) 1050 x 452=
17) 9158 x 522=
18) 4359 x 101=
19) 2152 x 738=
20) 1097 x 191=
21) 7584 x 929=
22) 5479 x 572=
23) 3125 x 306=
24) 2918 x 984=
25) 7980 x 376=
26) 7291 x 832=
27) 2352 x 546=
28) 1329 x 682=
29) 9716 x 791=
30) 5291 x 801=
31) 7147 x 630=
32) 2850 x 810=
33) 3273 x 723=
34) 7484 x 882=
35) 8917 x 379=
36) 8458 x 932=
37) 9036 x 241=
38) 1188 x 110=
39) 4550 x 385=
40) 4154 x 509=
41) 6525 x 600=
42) 6478 x 323=
43) 5166 x 978=
44) 5881 x 611=
45) 2377 x 516=
46) 7962 x 938=
47) 5851 x 472=
48) 4915 x 856=
49) 6402 x 166=
50) 2472 x 324=




Answers

1) 7768 * 959 = 7449512 2) 6236 * 173 = 1078828 3) 1610 * 849 = 1366890 4) 9251 * 306 = 2830806 5) 6546 * 886 = 5799756 6) 6448 * 661 = 4262128 7) 1108 * 553 = 612724 8) 4159 * 836 = 3476924 9) 7321 * 502 = 3675142 10) 8597 * 619 = 5321543 11) 6242 * 567 = 3539214 12) 2530 * 245 = 619850 13) 2078 * 965 = 2005270 14) 9984 * 469 = 4682496 15) 2007 * 348 = 698436 16) 1050 * 452 = 474600 17) 9158 * 522 = 4780476 18) 4359 * 101 = 440259 19) 2152 * 738 = 1588176 20) 1097 * 191 = 209527 21) 7584 * 929 = 7045536 22) 5479 * 572 = 3133988 23) 3125 * 306 = 956250 24) 2918 * 984 = 2871312 25) 7980 * 376 = 3000480 26) 7291 * 832 = 6066112 27) 2352 * 546 = 1284192 28) 1329 * 682 = 906378 29) 9716 * 791 = 7685356 30) 5291 * 801 = 4238091 31) 7147 * 630 = 4502610 32) 2850 * 810 = 2308500 33) 3273 * 723 = 2366379 34) 7484 * 882 = 6600888 35) 8917 * 379 = 3379543 36) 8458 * 932 = 7882856 37) 9036 * 241 = 2177676 38) 1188 * 110 = 130680 39) 4550 * 385 = 1751750 40) 4154 * 509 = 2114386 41) 6525 * 600 = 3915000 42) 6478 * 323 = 2092394 43) 5166 * 978 = 5052348 44) 5881 * 611 = 3593291 45) 2377 * 516 = 1226532 46) 7962 * 938 = 7468356 47) 5851 * 472 = 2761672 48) 4915 * 856 = 4207240 49) 6402 * 166 = 1062732 50) 2472 * 324 = 800928

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 40

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 40

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 94

Prime numbers Worksheet 94

Percent worksheets 94

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 94

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 94

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 94

Factors worksheet94

Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Ratios worksheets 93

Prime numbers Worksheet 93

Percent worksheets 93

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets