1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 41

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 41

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 11, 2020.

Questions

1) 7715 x 123=
2) 7908 x 783=
3) 6771 x 314=
4) 8630 x 856=
5) 5527 x 654=
6) 2808 x 583=
7) 8408 x 984=
8) 9506 x 987=
9) 8214 x 448=
10) 8888 x 399=
11) 3711 x 626=
12) 7709 x 827=
13) 4389 x 645=
14) 6217 x 582=
15) 9354 x 857=
16) 6808 x 808=
17) 4771 x 248=
18) 1900 x 493=
19) 9356 x 726=
20) 6340 x 357=
21) 9146 x 318=
22) 4439 x 482=
23) 1297 x 599=
24) 4158 x 147=
25) 2874 x 738=
26) 8625 x 166=
27) 2480 x 624=
28) 9201 x 697=
29) 2470 x 821=
30) 4684 x 538=
31) 1607 x 518=
32) 9527 x 763=
33) 4244 x 410=
34) 8266 x 586=
35) 7292 x 964=
36) 6708 x 997=
37) 7504 x 613=
38) 2277 x 298=
39) 5626 x 980=
40) 8300 x 232=
41) 7186 x 404=
42) 1851 x 110=
43) 6267 x 165=
44) 8939 x 921=
45) 2287 x 483=
46) 9979 x 334=
47) 1709 x 216=
48) 3813 x 547=
49) 9516 x 777=
50) 2227 x 304=




Answers

1) 7715 * 123 = 948945 2) 7908 * 783 = 6191964 3) 6771 * 314 = 2126094 4) 8630 * 856 = 7387280 5) 5527 * 654 = 3614658 6) 2808 * 583 = 1637064 7) 8408 * 984 = 8273472 8) 9506 * 987 = 9382422 9) 8214 * 448 = 3679872 10) 8888 * 399 = 3546312 11) 3711 * 626 = 2323086 12) 7709 * 827 = 6375343 13) 4389 * 645 = 2830905 14) 6217 * 582 = 3618294 15) 9354 * 857 = 8016378 16) 6808 * 808 = 5500864 17) 4771 * 248 = 1183208 18) 1900 * 493 = 936700 19) 9356 * 726 = 6792456 20) 6340 * 357 = 2263380 21) 9146 * 318 = 2908428 22) 4439 * 482 = 2139598 23) 1297 * 599 = 776903 24) 4158 * 147 = 611226 25) 2874 * 738 = 2121012 26) 8625 * 166 = 1431750 27) 2480 * 624 = 1547520 28) 9201 * 697 = 6413097 29) 2470 * 821 = 2027870 30) 4684 * 538 = 2519992 31) 1607 * 518 = 832426 32) 9527 * 763 = 7269101 33) 4244 * 410 = 1740040 34) 8266 * 586 = 4843876 35) 7292 * 964 = 7029488 36) 6708 * 997 = 6687876 37) 7504 * 613 = 4599952 38) 2277 * 298 = 678546 39) 5626 * 980 = 5513480 40) 8300 * 232 = 1925600 41) 7186 * 404 = 2903144 42) 1851 * 110 = 203610 43) 6267 * 165 = 1034055 44) 8939 * 921 = 8232819 45) 2287 * 483 = 1104621 46) 9979 * 334 = 3332986 47) 1709 * 216 = 369144 48) 3813 * 547 = 2085711 49) 9516 * 777 = 7393932 50) 2227 * 304 = 677008

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 41

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 41

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 81

Prime numbers Worksheet 81

Percent worksheets 81

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 81

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 81

Factors worksheet81

Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Ratios worksheets 80

Prime numbers Worksheet 80

Percent worksheets 80

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets