1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 42

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 42

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 12, 2020.

Questions

1) 2069 x 189=
2) 1302 x 274=
3) 4326 x 134=
4) 9695 x 197=
5) 4126 x 433=
6) 6789 x 915=
7) 4969 x 959=
8) 2525 x 175=
9) 5097 x 898=
10) 3477 x 773=
11) 1383 x 931=
12) 5542 x 946=
13) 5674 x 613=
14) 5776 x 316=
15) 8631 x 986=
16) 5935 x 339=
17) 7593 x 770=
18) 3377 x 436=
19) 4453 x 602=
20) 7049 x 390=
21) 5841 x 326=
22) 4640 x 111=
23) 4159 x 587=
24) 6757 x 906=
25) 8574 x 639=
26) 4055 x 791=
27) 7700 x 542=
28) 4069 x 407=
29) 3559 x 592=
30) 7318 x 544=
31) 2960 x 832=
32) 1424 x 603=
33) 8122 x 343=
34) 4819 x 177=
35) 1667 x 940=
36) 7860 x 340=
37) 4430 x 259=
38) 1913 x 209=
39) 6731 x 671=
40) 9226 x 272=
41) 2413 x 354=
42) 2443 x 863=
43) 7630 x 646=
44) 4787 x 306=
45) 2085 x 729=
46) 3335 x 779=
47) 3448 x 434=
48) 7336 x 277=
49) 7331 x 142=
50) 8558 x 122=




Answers

1) 2069 * 189 = 391041 2) 1302 * 274 = 356748 3) 4326 * 134 = 579684 4) 9695 * 197 = 1909915 5) 4126 * 433 = 1786558 6) 6789 * 915 = 6211935 7) 4969 * 959 = 4765271 8) 2525 * 175 = 441875 9) 5097 * 898 = 4577106 10) 3477 * 773 = 2687721 11) 1383 * 931 = 1287573 12) 5542 * 946 = 5242732 13) 5674 * 613 = 3478162 14) 5776 * 316 = 1825216 15) 8631 * 986 = 8510166 16) 5935 * 339 = 2011965 17) 7593 * 770 = 5846610 18) 3377 * 436 = 1472372 19) 4453 * 602 = 2680706 20) 7049 * 390 = 2749110 21) 5841 * 326 = 1904166 22) 4640 * 111 = 515040 23) 4159 * 587 = 2441333 24) 6757 * 906 = 6121842 25) 8574 * 639 = 5478786 26) 4055 * 791 = 3207505 27) 7700 * 542 = 4173400 28) 4069 * 407 = 1656083 29) 3559 * 592 = 2106928 30) 7318 * 544 = 3980992 31) 2960 * 832 = 2462720 32) 1424 * 603 = 858672 33) 8122 * 343 = 2785846 34) 4819 * 177 = 852963 35) 1667 * 940 = 1566980 36) 7860 * 340 = 2672400 37) 4430 * 259 = 1147370 38) 1913 * 209 = 399817 39) 6731 * 671 = 4516501 40) 9226 * 272 = 2509472 41) 2413 * 354 = 854202 42) 2443 * 863 = 2108309 43) 7630 * 646 = 4928980 44) 4787 * 306 = 1464822 45) 2085 * 729 = 1519965 46) 3335 * 779 = 2597965 47) 3448 * 434 = 1496432 48) 7336 * 277 = 2032072 49) 7331 * 142 = 1041002 50) 8558 * 122 = 1044076

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 42

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 42

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 81

Prime numbers Worksheet 81

Percent worksheets 81

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 81

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 81

Factors worksheet81

Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Ratios worksheets 80

Prime numbers Worksheet 80

Percent worksheets 80

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets