JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 44

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 44

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on October 14, 2020.

Questions

1) 4438 x 511=
2) 3180 x 926=
3) 5628 x 410=
4) 1794 x 408=
5) 8660 x 276=
6) 1112 x 912=
7) 7541 x 836=
8) 9473 x 891=
9) 1809 x 108=
10) 7466 x 293=
11) 2112 x 458=
12) 1748 x 446=
13) 8910 x 396=
14) 9142 x 511=
15) 7936 x 205=
16) 8865 x 928=
17) 7341 x 512=
18) 3780 x 874=
19) 1190 x 526=
20) 9679 x 864=
21) 7967 x 254=
22) 7098 x 957=
23) 5145 x 380=
24) 3501 x 819=
25) 8934 x 714=
26) 3143 x 366=
27) 1251 x 913=
28) 8042 x 789=
29) 3481 x 309=
30) 8696 x 878=
31) 7181 x 594=
32) 3694 x 731=
33) 1209 x 223=
34) 6925 x 579=
35) 8787 x 989=
36) 2468 x 268=
37) 7450 x 803=
38) 3959 x 667=
39) 2794 x 922=
40) 5037 x 142=
41) 6493 x 446=
42) 2650 x 196=
43) 3514 x 760=
44) 1091 x 114=
45) 3567 x 183=
46) 8610 x 721=
47) 8326 x 893=
48) 1349 x 308=
49) 9674 x 144=
50) 8984 x 810=




Answers

1) 4438 * 511 = 2267818 2) 3180 * 926 = 2944680 3) 5628 * 410 = 2307480 4) 1794 * 408 = 731952 5) 8660 * 276 = 2390160 6) 1112 * 912 = 1014144 7) 7541 * 836 = 6304276 8) 9473 * 891 = 8440443 9) 1809 * 108 = 195372 10) 7466 * 293 = 2187538 11) 2112 * 458 = 967296 12) 1748 * 446 = 779608 13) 8910 * 396 = 3528360 14) 9142 * 511 = 4671562 15) 7936 * 205 = 1626880 16) 8865 * 928 = 8226720 17) 7341 * 512 = 3758592 18) 3780 * 874 = 3303720 19) 1190 * 526 = 625940 20) 9679 * 864 = 8362656 21) 7967 * 254 = 2023618 22) 7098 * 957 = 6792786 23) 5145 * 380 = 1955100 24) 3501 * 819 = 2867319 25) 8934 * 714 = 6378876 26) 3143 * 366 = 1150338 27) 1251 * 913 = 1142163 28) 8042 * 789 = 6345138 29) 3481 * 309 = 1075629 30) 8696 * 878 = 7635088 31) 7181 * 594 = 4265514 32) 3694 * 731 = 2700314 33) 1209 * 223 = 269607 34) 6925 * 579 = 4009575 35) 8787 * 989 = 8690343 36) 2468 * 268 = 661424 37) 7450 * 803 = 5982350 38) 3959 * 667 = 2640653 39) 2794 * 922 = 2576068 40) 5037 * 142 = 715254 41) 6493 * 446 = 2895878 42) 2650 * 196 = 519400 43) 3514 * 760 = 2670640 44) 1091 * 114 = 124374 45) 3567 * 183 = 652761 46) 8610 * 721 = 6207810 47) 8326 * 893 = 7435118 48) 1349 * 308 = 415492 49) 9674 * 144 = 1393056 50) 8984 * 810 = 7277040

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 44

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 44

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets