1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 45

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 45

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 15, 2020.

Questions

1) 4564 x 214=
2) 4912 x 282=
3) 5245 x 259=
4) 3255 x 584=
5) 5621 x 364=
6) 1479 x 152=
7) 3377 x 998=
8) 7085 x 417=
9) 7644 x 788=
10) 7994 x 661=
11) 7401 x 112=
12) 9942 x 620=
13) 5489 x 543=
14) 5330 x 135=
15) 2380 x 407=
16) 1224 x 139=
17) 8824 x 319=
18) 8822 x 102=
19) 3687 x 820=
20) 9357 x 637=
21) 3499 x 207=
22) 5257 x 593=
23) 8322 x 191=
24) 3475 x 743=
25) 9301 x 354=
26) 7023 x 693=
27) 2829 x 759=
28) 8658 x 163=
29) 3769 x 423=
30) 2157 x 164=
31) 4670 x 546=
32) 7181 x 211=
33) 4874 x 333=
34) 8609 x 446=
35) 3939 x 230=
36) 8465 x 761=
37) 4099 x 916=
38) 5193 x 806=
39) 7996 x 170=
40) 9187 x 365=
41) 8265 x 842=
42) 1405 x 411=
43) 2648 x 275=
44) 5875 x 964=
45) 5071 x 228=
46) 7582 x 883=
47) 2071 x 356=
48) 4935 x 941=
49) 9608 x 220=
50) 3156 x 341=




Answers

1) 4564 * 214 = 976696 2) 4912 * 282 = 1385184 3) 5245 * 259 = 1358455 4) 3255 * 584 = 1900920 5) 5621 * 364 = 2046044 6) 1479 * 152 = 224808 7) 3377 * 998 = 3370246 8) 7085 * 417 = 2954445 9) 7644 * 788 = 6023472 10) 7994 * 661 = 5284034 11) 7401 * 112 = 828912 12) 9942 * 620 = 6164040 13) 5489 * 543 = 2980527 14) 5330 * 135 = 719550 15) 2380 * 407 = 968660 16) 1224 * 139 = 170136 17) 8824 * 319 = 2814856 18) 8822 * 102 = 899844 19) 3687 * 820 = 3023340 20) 9357 * 637 = 5960409 21) 3499 * 207 = 724293 22) 5257 * 593 = 3117401 23) 8322 * 191 = 1589502 24) 3475 * 743 = 2581925 25) 9301 * 354 = 3292554 26) 7023 * 693 = 4866939 27) 2829 * 759 = 2147211 28) 8658 * 163 = 1411254 29) 3769 * 423 = 1594287 30) 2157 * 164 = 353748 31) 4670 * 546 = 2549820 32) 7181 * 211 = 1515191 33) 4874 * 333 = 1623042 34) 8609 * 446 = 3839614 35) 3939 * 230 = 905970 36) 8465 * 761 = 6441865 37) 4099 * 916 = 3754684 38) 5193 * 806 = 4185558 39) 7996 * 170 = 1359320 40) 9187 * 365 = 3353255 41) 8265 * 842 = 6959130 42) 1405 * 411 = 577455 43) 2648 * 275 = 728200 44) 5875 * 964 = 5663500 45) 5071 * 228 = 1156188 46) 7582 * 883 = 6694906 47) 2071 * 356 = 737276 48) 4935 * 941 = 4643835 49) 9608 * 220 = 2113760 50) 3156 * 341 = 1076196

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 45

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 45

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 81

Prime numbers Worksheet 81

Percent worksheets 81

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 81

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 81

Factors worksheet81

Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Ratios worksheets 80

Prime numbers Worksheet 80

Percent worksheets 80

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets