1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 46

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 46

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on October 16, 2020.

Questions

1) 3742 x 666=
2) 9693 x 807=
3) 5996 x 864=
4) 1527 x 353=
5) 9990 x 693=
6) 1084 x 394=
7) 7980 x 308=
8) 6254 x 614=
9) 6265 x 519=
10) 1184 x 872=
11) 4641 x 742=
12) 2196 x 554=
13) 4247 x 366=
14) 3521 x 962=
15) 8795 x 155=
16) 5771 x 871=
17) 9684 x 403=
18) 1546 x 275=
19) 2320 x 557=
20) 2942 x 216=
21) 7005 x 468=
22) 7825 x 410=
23) 3979 x 870=
24) 3251 x 463=
25) 9694 x 654=
26) 2845 x 678=
27) 9039 x 252=
28) 7148 x 653=
29) 1443 x 108=
30) 6932 x 330=
31) 4097 x 217=
32) 1243 x 725=
33) 4932 x 467=
34) 9302 x 950=
35) 7524 x 115=
36) 1484 x 965=
37) 2494 x 633=
38) 3124 x 434=
39) 3216 x 519=
40) 3679 x 831=
41) 6909 x 446=
42) 2553 x 582=
43) 7727 x 846=
44) 9610 x 643=
45) 5862 x 308=
46) 1102 x 417=
47) 7148 x 527=
48) 8788 x 721=
49) 9941 x 728=
50) 9097 x 671=




Answers

1) 3742 * 666 = 2492172 2) 9693 * 807 = 7822251 3) 5996 * 864 = 5180544 4) 1527 * 353 = 539031 5) 9990 * 693 = 6923070 6) 1084 * 394 = 427096 7) 7980 * 308 = 2457840 8) 6254 * 614 = 3839956 9) 6265 * 519 = 3251535 10) 1184 * 872 = 1032448 11) 4641 * 742 = 3443622 12) 2196 * 554 = 1216584 13) 4247 * 366 = 1554402 14) 3521 * 962 = 3387202 15) 8795 * 155 = 1363225 16) 5771 * 871 = 5026541 17) 9684 * 403 = 3902652 18) 1546 * 275 = 425150 19) 2320 * 557 = 1292240 20) 2942 * 216 = 635472 21) 7005 * 468 = 3278340 22) 7825 * 410 = 3208250 23) 3979 * 870 = 3461730 24) 3251 * 463 = 1505213 25) 9694 * 654 = 6339876 26) 2845 * 678 = 1928910 27) 9039 * 252 = 2277828 28) 7148 * 653 = 4667644 29) 1443 * 108 = 155844 30) 6932 * 330 = 2287560 31) 4097 * 217 = 889049 32) 1243 * 725 = 901175 33) 4932 * 467 = 2303244 34) 9302 * 950 = 8836900 35) 7524 * 115 = 865260 36) 1484 * 965 = 1432060 37) 2494 * 633 = 1578702 38) 3124 * 434 = 1355816 39) 3216 * 519 = 1669104 40) 3679 * 831 = 3057249 41) 6909 * 446 = 3081414 42) 2553 * 582 = 1485846 43) 7727 * 846 = 6537042 44) 9610 * 643 = 6179230 45) 5862 * 308 = 1805496 46) 1102 * 417 = 459534 47) 7148 * 527 = 3766996 48) 8788 * 721 = 6336148 49) 9941 * 728 = 7237048 50) 9097 * 671 = 6104087

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 46

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 46

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 91

Prime numbers Worksheet 91

Percent worksheets 91

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 91

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 91

Factors worksheet91

Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Ratios worksheets 90

Prime numbers Worksheet 90

Percent worksheets 90

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets