1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 47

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 47

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on October 17, 2020.

Questions

1) 5738 x 489=
2) 6610 x 570=
3) 8651 x 725=
4) 3606 x 149=
5) 8902 x 484=
6) 5712 x 703=
7) 4557 x 118=
8) 3826 x 935=
9) 2418 x 489=
10) 1838 x 155=
11) 1215 x 652=
12) 9929 x 457=
13) 8457 x 974=
14) 4743 x 172=
15) 8535 x 705=
16) 7054 x 423=
17) 8218 x 525=
18) 7973 x 666=
19) 6021 x 501=
20) 8188 x 447=
21) 2499 x 313=
22) 5612 x 643=
23) 4086 x 231=
24) 9377 x 863=
25) 9143 x 277=
26) 6169 x 132=
27) 8942 x 760=
28) 6307 x 169=
29) 5804 x 111=
30) 9473 x 110=
31) 4287 x 491=
32) 9596 x 772=
33) 6340 x 746=
34) 6957 x 805=
35) 5381 x 316=
36) 7487 x 848=
37) 6026 x 762=
38) 8233 x 990=
39) 4115 x 669=
40) 6452 x 811=
41) 5224 x 859=
42) 3853 x 358=
43) 9368 x 343=
44) 8201 x 653=
45) 9019 x 676=
46) 1975 x 422=
47) 4474 x 467=
48) 3397 x 635=
49) 8362 x 928=
50) 1235 x 521=




Answers

1) 5738 * 489 = 2805882 2) 6610 * 570 = 3767700 3) 8651 * 725 = 6271975 4) 3606 * 149 = 537294 5) 8902 * 484 = 4308568 6) 5712 * 703 = 4015536 7) 4557 * 118 = 537726 8) 3826 * 935 = 3577310 9) 2418 * 489 = 1182402 10) 1838 * 155 = 284890 11) 1215 * 652 = 792180 12) 9929 * 457 = 4537553 13) 8457 * 974 = 8237118 14) 4743 * 172 = 815796 15) 8535 * 705 = 6017175 16) 7054 * 423 = 2983842 17) 8218 * 525 = 4314450 18) 7973 * 666 = 5310018 19) 6021 * 501 = 3016521 20) 8188 * 447 = 3660036 21) 2499 * 313 = 782187 22) 5612 * 643 = 3608516 23) 4086 * 231 = 943866 24) 9377 * 863 = 8092351 25) 9143 * 277 = 2532611 26) 6169 * 132 = 814308 27) 8942 * 760 = 6795920 28) 6307 * 169 = 1065883 29) 5804 * 111 = 644244 30) 9473 * 110 = 1042030 31) 4287 * 491 = 2104917 32) 9596 * 772 = 7408112 33) 6340 * 746 = 4729640 34) 6957 * 805 = 5600385 35) 5381 * 316 = 1700396 36) 7487 * 848 = 6348976 37) 6026 * 762 = 4591812 38) 8233 * 990 = 8150670 39) 4115 * 669 = 2752935 40) 6452 * 811 = 5232572 41) 5224 * 859 = 4487416 42) 3853 * 358 = 1379374 43) 9368 * 343 = 3213224 44) 8201 * 653 = 5355253 45) 9019 * 676 = 6096844 46) 1975 * 422 = 833450 47) 4474 * 467 = 2089358 48) 3397 * 635 = 2157095 49) 8362 * 928 = 7759936 50) 1235 * 521 = 643435

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 47

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 47

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 91

Prime numbers Worksheet 91

Percent worksheets 91

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 91

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 91

Factors worksheet91

Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Ratios worksheets 90

Prime numbers Worksheet 90

Percent worksheets 90

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets