1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 48

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 48

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on October 18, 2020.

Questions

1) 3864 x 465=
2) 5929 x 242=
3) 1652 x 675=
4) 3016 x 125=
5) 1887 x 946=
6) 3904 x 364=
7) 4166 x 191=
8) 3732 x 203=
9) 1185 x 592=
10) 2259 x 534=
11) 6741 x 291=
12) 3193 x 794=
13) 8399 x 330=
14) 1612 x 117=
15) 1135 x 401=
16) 6444 x 797=
17) 1821 x 329=
18) 1746 x 124=
19) 7524 x 347=
20) 5466 x 701=
21) 6057 x 483=
22) 4178 x 520=
23) 1037 x 248=
24) 8076 x 641=
25) 3254 x 702=
26) 8733 x 563=
27) 5561 x 291=
28) 2694 x 459=
29) 8114 x 431=
30) 9055 x 451=
31) 8857 x 620=
32) 8476 x 675=
33) 1544 x 542=
34) 5676 x 486=
35) 1822 x 938=
36) 7510 x 424=
37) 1031 x 427=
38) 8524 x 99=
39) 4215 x 501=
40) 5335 x 835=
41) 9891 x 607=
42) 1982 x 995=
43) 2561 x 359=
44) 3813 x 929=
45) 8565 x 977=
46) 9772 x 335=
47) 3963 x 522=
48) 6665 x 192=
49) 9888 x 972=
50) 2633 x 155=




Answers

1) 3864 * 465 = 1796760 2) 5929 * 242 = 1434818 3) 1652 * 675 = 1115100 4) 3016 * 125 = 377000 5) 1887 * 946 = 1785102 6) 3904 * 364 = 1421056 7) 4166 * 191 = 795706 8) 3732 * 203 = 757596 9) 1185 * 592 = 701520 10) 2259 * 534 = 1206306 11) 6741 * 291 = 1961631 12) 3193 * 794 = 2535242 13) 8399 * 330 = 2771670 14) 1612 * 117 = 188604 15) 1135 * 401 = 455135 16) 6444 * 797 = 5135868 17) 1821 * 329 = 599109 18) 1746 * 124 = 216504 19) 7524 * 347 = 2610828 20) 5466 * 701 = 3831666 21) 6057 * 483 = 2925531 22) 4178 * 520 = 2172560 23) 1037 * 248 = 257176 24) 8076 * 641 = 5176716 25) 3254 * 702 = 2284308 26) 8733 * 563 = 4916679 27) 5561 * 291 = 1618251 28) 2694 * 459 = 1236546 29) 8114 * 431 = 3497134 30) 9055 * 451 = 4083805 31) 8857 * 620 = 5491340 32) 8476 * 675 = 5721300 33) 1544 * 542 = 836848 34) 5676 * 486 = 2758536 35) 1822 * 938 = 1709036 36) 7510 * 424 = 3184240 37) 1031 * 427 = 440237 38) 8524 * 99 = 843876 39) 4215 * 501 = 2111715 40) 5335 * 835 = 4454725 41) 9891 * 607 = 6003837 42) 1982 * 995 = 1972090 43) 2561 * 359 = 919399 44) 3813 * 929 = 3542277 45) 8565 * 977 = 8368005 46) 9772 * 335 = 3273620 47) 3963 * 522 = 2068686 48) 6665 * 192 = 1279680 49) 9888 * 972 = 9611136 50) 2633 * 155 = 408115

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 48

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 48

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 91

Prime numbers Worksheet 91

Percent worksheets 91

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 91

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 91

Factors worksheet91

Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Ratios worksheets 90

Prime numbers Worksheet 90

Percent worksheets 90

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets