1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 49

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 49

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on October 19, 2020.

Questions

1) 3815 x 689=
2) 7895 x 568=
3) 2016 x 535=
4) 3778 x 278=
5) 8142 x 946=
6) 3434 x 455=
7) 7385 x 608=
8) 5886 x 333=
9) 6746 x 996=
10) 1306 x 766=
11) 3739 x 675=
12) 8068 x 611=
13) 4292 x 295=
14) 7997 x 918=
15) 6102 x 800=
16) 1916 x 418=
17) 5035 x 942=
18) 1085 x 993=
19) 4677 x 421=
20) 1304 x 136=
21) 9990 x 511=
22) 3068 x 781=
23) 4894 x 721=
24) 7891 x 262=
25) 8527 x 286=
26) 5918 x 643=
27) 8707 x 675=
28) 2030 x 633=
29) 1365 x 732=
30) 7786 x 804=
31) 6310 x 844=
32) 8145 x 198=
33) 2273 x 975=
34) 1663 x 880=
35) 7244 x 917=
36) 7184 x 931=
37) 7192 x 677=
38) 6211 x 368=
39) 3527 x 114=
40) 9896 x 619=
41) 3913 x 354=
42) 5398 x 955=
43) 8879 x 632=
44) 2285 x 867=
45) 4725 x 720=
46) 4174 x 574=
47) 9575 x 507=
48) 4388 x 435=
49) 1747 x 138=
50) 1891 x 995=




Answers

1) 3815 * 689 = 2628535 2) 7895 * 568 = 4484360 3) 2016 * 535 = 1078560 4) 3778 * 278 = 1050284 5) 8142 * 946 = 7702332 6) 3434 * 455 = 1562470 7) 7385 * 608 = 4490080 8) 5886 * 333 = 1960038 9) 6746 * 996 = 6719016 10) 1306 * 766 = 1000396 11) 3739 * 675 = 2523825 12) 8068 * 611 = 4929548 13) 4292 * 295 = 1266140 14) 7997 * 918 = 7341246 15) 6102 * 800 = 4881600 16) 1916 * 418 = 800888 17) 5035 * 942 = 4742970 18) 1085 * 993 = 1077405 19) 4677 * 421 = 1969017 20) 1304 * 136 = 177344 21) 9990 * 511 = 5104890 22) 3068 * 781 = 2396108 23) 4894 * 721 = 3528574 24) 7891 * 262 = 2067442 25) 8527 * 286 = 2438722 26) 5918 * 643 = 3805274 27) 8707 * 675 = 5877225 28) 2030 * 633 = 1284990 29) 1365 * 732 = 999180 30) 7786 * 804 = 6259944 31) 6310 * 844 = 5325640 32) 8145 * 198 = 1612710 33) 2273 * 975 = 2216175 34) 1663 * 880 = 1463440 35) 7244 * 917 = 6642748 36) 7184 * 931 = 6688304 37) 7192 * 677 = 4868984 38) 6211 * 368 = 2285648 39) 3527 * 114 = 402078 40) 9896 * 619 = 6125624 41) 3913 * 354 = 1385202 42) 5398 * 955 = 5155090 43) 8879 * 632 = 5611528 44) 2285 * 867 = 1981095 45) 4725 * 720 = 3402000 46) 4174 * 574 = 2395876 47) 9575 * 507 = 4854525 48) 4388 * 435 = 1908780 49) 1747 * 138 = 241086 50) 1891 * 995 = 1881545

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 49

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 49

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 91

Prime numbers Worksheet 91

Percent worksheets 91

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 91

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 91

Factors worksheet91

Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Ratios worksheets 90

Prime numbers Worksheet 90

Percent worksheets 90

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets