JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 5

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 5

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 5, 2020.

Questions

1) 2015 x 241=
2) 2467 x 757=
3) 4103 x 403=
4) 2323 x 946=
5) 6359 x 423=
6) 3394 x 613=
7) 4462 x 785=
8) 6078 x 530=
9) 1533 x 410=
10) 1754 x 683=
11) 3893 x 449=
12) 8198 x 234=
13) 3296 x 529=
14) 9008 x 492=
15) 8054 x 998=
16) 6534 x 164=
17) 1496 x 329=
18) 8359 x 169=
19) 8962 x 250=
20) 4198 x 538=
21) 1236 x 468=
22) 8997 x 199=
23) 6177 x 981=
24) 1513 x 389=
25) 1224 x 374=
26) 2082 x 100=
27) 4353 x 991=
28) 2675 x 181=
29) 4331 x 411=
30) 8607 x 170=
31) 7592 x 996=
32) 3374 x 187=
33) 1710 x 540=
34) 5314 x 934=
35) 1579 x 941=
36) 7974 x 627=
37) 3250 x 992=
38) 9351 x 776=
39) 4222 x 767=
40) 4154 x 878=
41) 3387 x 351=
42) 5441 x 329=
43) 8231 x 100=
44) 1643 x 130=
45) 9393 x 434=
46) 2642 x 513=
47) 5467 x 787=
48) 3333 x 946=
49) 5239 x 218=
50) 5482 x 298=




Answers

1) 2015 * 241 = 485615 2) 2467 * 757 = 1867519 3) 4103 * 403 = 1653509 4) 2323 * 946 = 2197558 5) 6359 * 423 = 2689857 6) 3394 * 613 = 2080522 7) 4462 * 785 = 3502670 8) 6078 * 530 = 3221340 9) 1533 * 410 = 628530 10) 1754 * 683 = 1197982 11) 3893 * 449 = 1747957 12) 8198 * 234 = 1918332 13) 3296 * 529 = 1743584 14) 9008 * 492 = 4431936 15) 8054 * 998 = 8037892 16) 6534 * 164 = 1071576 17) 1496 * 329 = 492184 18) 8359 * 169 = 1412671 19) 8962 * 250 = 2240500 20) 4198 * 538 = 2258524 21) 1236 * 468 = 578448 22) 8997 * 199 = 1790403 23) 6177 * 981 = 6059637 24) 1513 * 389 = 588557 25) 1224 * 374 = 457776 26) 2082 * 100 = 208200 27) 4353 * 991 = 4313823 28) 2675 * 181 = 484175 29) 4331 * 411 = 1780041 30) 8607 * 170 = 1463190 31) 7592 * 996 = 7561632 32) 3374 * 187 = 630938 33) 1710 * 540 = 923400 34) 5314 * 934 = 4963276 35) 1579 * 941 = 1485839 36) 7974 * 627 = 4999698 37) 3250 * 992 = 3224000 38) 9351 * 776 = 7256376 39) 4222 * 767 = 3238274 40) 4154 * 878 = 3647212 41) 3387 * 351 = 1188837 42) 5441 * 329 = 1790089 43) 8231 * 100 = 823100 44) 1643 * 130 = 213590 45) 9393 * 434 = 4076562 46) 2642 * 513 = 1355346 47) 5467 * 787 = 4302529 48) 3333 * 946 = 3153018 49) 5239 * 218 = 1142102 50) 5482 * 298 = 1633636

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 5

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 5

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets