1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 50

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 50

Last updated on December 3, 2020. Created on October 20, 2020.

Questions

1) 3838 x 820=
2) 2678 x 456=
3) 2309 x 798=
4) 2508 x 888=
5) 4236 x 351=
6) 6963 x 289=
7) 7126 x 829=
8) 7340 x 901=
9) 8316 x 145=
10) 5851 x 999=
11) 6474 x 171=
12) 3759 x 482=
13) 6143 x 413=
14) 1089 x 329=
15) 2143 x 795=
16) 7301 x 940=
17) 3081 x 808=
18) 9822 x 663=
19) 4114 x 893=
20) 8971 x 742=
21) 9668 x 551=
22) 9652 x 944=
23) 4993 x 867=
24) 5719 x 652=
25) 2471 x 148=
26) 8448 x 397=
27) 7652 x 393=
28) 8874 x 697=
29) 1067 x 564=
30) 2914 x 531=
31) 9014 x 325=
32) 2379 x 155=
33) 7641 x 531=
34) 9112 x 509=
35) 2731 x 532=
36) 1008 x 120=
37) 3452 x 223=
38) 6721 x 463=
39) 4694 x 624=
40) 3981 x 338=
41) 4573 x 261=
42) 6631 x 451=
43) 1082 x 833=
44) 4458 x 380=
45) 6947 x 747=
46) 5328 x 340=
47) 9807 x 545=
48) 6442 x 993=
49) 2624 x 265=
50) 3340 x 967=




Answers

1) 3838 * 820 = 3147160 2) 2678 * 456 = 1221168 3) 2309 * 798 = 1842582 4) 2508 * 888 = 2227104 5) 4236 * 351 = 1486836 6) 6963 * 289 = 2012307 7) 7126 * 829 = 5907454 8) 7340 * 901 = 6613340 9) 8316 * 145 = 1205820 10) 5851 * 999 = 5845149 11) 6474 * 171 = 1107054 12) 3759 * 482 = 1811838 13) 6143 * 413 = 2537059 14) 1089 * 329 = 358281 15) 2143 * 795 = 1703685 16) 7301 * 940 = 6862940 17) 3081 * 808 = 2489448 18) 9822 * 663 = 6511986 19) 4114 * 893 = 3673802 20) 8971 * 742 = 6656482 21) 9668 * 551 = 5327068 22) 9652 * 944 = 9111488 23) 4993 * 867 = 4328931 24) 5719 * 652 = 3728788 25) 2471 * 148 = 365708 26) 8448 * 397 = 3353856 27) 7652 * 393 = 3007236 28) 8874 * 697 = 6185178 29) 1067 * 564 = 601788 30) 2914 * 531 = 1547334 31) 9014 * 325 = 2929550 32) 2379 * 155 = 368745 33) 7641 * 531 = 4057371 34) 9112 * 509 = 4638008 35) 2731 * 532 = 1452892 36) 1008 * 120 = 120960 37) 3452 * 223 = 769796 38) 6721 * 463 = 3111823 39) 4694 * 624 = 2929056 40) 3981 * 338 = 1345578 41) 4573 * 261 = 1193553 42) 6631 * 451 = 2990581 43) 1082 * 833 = 901306 44) 4458 * 380 = 1694040 45) 6947 * 747 = 5189409 46) 5328 * 340 = 1811520 47) 9807 * 545 = 5344815 48) 6442 * 993 = 6396906 49) 2624 * 265 = 695360 50) 3340 * 967 = 3229780

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 50

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 50

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 94

Prime numbers Worksheet 94

Percent worksheets 94

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 94

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 94

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 94

Factors worksheet94

Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Ratios worksheets 93

Prime numbers Worksheet 93

Percent worksheets 93

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets