1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 51

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 51

Last updated on December 3, 2020. Created on October 21, 2020.

Questions

1) 9612 x 487=
2) 2987 x 277=
3) 9985 x 115=
4) 2956 x 194=
5) 6117 x 428=
6) 4919 x 384=
7) 7525 x 675=
8) 9154 x 470=
9) 9040 x 569=
10) 3323 x 779=
11) 7876 x 213=
12) 6534 x 730=
13) 5723 x 132=
14) 1748 x 656=
15) 7758 x 551=
16) 5248 x 289=
17) 2376 x 901=
18) 3867 x 632=
19) 7230 x 472=
20) 1947 x 313=
21) 3977 x 341=
22) 9251 x 469=
23) 3479 x 874=
24) 5860 x 630=
25) 8211 x 474=
26) 3870 x 129=
27) 4093 x 827=
28) 2774 x 353=
29) 6340 x 951=
30) 1213 x 881=
31) 1455 x 547=
32) 5589 x 209=
33) 4441 x 580=
34) 3139 x 711=
35) 7737 x 877=
36) 1365 x 185=
37) 6634 x 136=
38) 3126 x 841=
39) 4199 x 611=
40) 3755 x 144=
41) 1108 x 99=
42) 6963 x 975=
43) 6555 x 583=
44) 7722 x 709=
45) 7464 x 454=
46) 4525 x 146=
47) 2470 x 126=
48) 4519 x 576=
49) 7161 x 780=
50) 4835 x 480=




Answers

1) 9612 * 487 = 4681044 2) 2987 * 277 = 827399 3) 9985 * 115 = 1148275 4) 2956 * 194 = 573464 5) 6117 * 428 = 2618076 6) 4919 * 384 = 1888896 7) 7525 * 675 = 5079375 8) 9154 * 470 = 4302380 9) 9040 * 569 = 5143760 10) 3323 * 779 = 2588617 11) 7876 * 213 = 1677588 12) 6534 * 730 = 4769820 13) 5723 * 132 = 755436 14) 1748 * 656 = 1146688 15) 7758 * 551 = 4274658 16) 5248 * 289 = 1516672 17) 2376 * 901 = 2140776 18) 3867 * 632 = 2443944 19) 7230 * 472 = 3412560 20) 1947 * 313 = 609411 21) 3977 * 341 = 1356157 22) 9251 * 469 = 4338719 23) 3479 * 874 = 3040646 24) 5860 * 630 = 3691800 25) 8211 * 474 = 3892014 26) 3870 * 129 = 499230 27) 4093 * 827 = 3384911 28) 2774 * 353 = 979222 29) 6340 * 951 = 6029340 30) 1213 * 881 = 1068653 31) 1455 * 547 = 795885 32) 5589 * 209 = 1168101 33) 4441 * 580 = 2575780 34) 3139 * 711 = 2231829 35) 7737 * 877 = 6785349 36) 1365 * 185 = 252525 37) 6634 * 136 = 902224 38) 3126 * 841 = 2628966 39) 4199 * 611 = 2565589 40) 3755 * 144 = 540720 41) 1108 * 99 = 109692 42) 6963 * 975 = 6788925 43) 6555 * 583 = 3821565 44) 7722 * 709 = 5474898 45) 7464 * 454 = 3388656 46) 4525 * 146 = 660650 47) 2470 * 126 = 311220 48) 4519 * 576 = 2602944 49) 7161 * 780 = 5585580 50) 4835 * 480 = 2320800

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 51

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 51

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 94

Prime numbers Worksheet 94

Percent worksheets 94

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 94

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 94

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 94

Factors worksheet94

Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Ratios worksheets 93

Prime numbers Worksheet 93

Percent worksheets 93

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets