1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 52

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 52

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 22, 2020.

Questions

1) 3865 x 880=
2) 4117 x 663=
3) 7499 x 247=
4) 1846 x 515=
5) 1274 x 418=
6) 5704 x 808=
7) 8620 x 864=
8) 3292 x 889=
9) 8066 x 639=
10) 9622 x 496=
11) 7896 x 512=
12) 5951 x 374=
13) 1432 x 977=
14) 4977 x 754=
15) 7691 x 769=
16) 4951 x 711=
17) 4172 x 789=
18) 9834 x 170=
19) 8948 x 834=
20) 5479 x 210=
21) 1818 x 797=
22) 4000 x 313=
23) 9956 x 829=
24) 7521 x 289=
25) 2328 x 120=
26) 9929 x 538=
27) 1901 x 778=
28) 9461 x 898=
29) 2823 x 266=
30) 3075 x 855=
31) 5442 x 822=
32) 7932 x 361=
33) 3667 x 857=
34) 6398 x 114=
35) 5770 x 574=
36) 2264 x 661=
37) 5847 x 121=
38) 2219 x 370=
39) 1130 x 843=
40) 6788 x 374=
41) 6561 x 376=
42) 9070 x 712=
43) 8063 x 157=
44) 6862 x 481=
45) 3516 x 829=
46) 6394 x 585=
47) 5937 x 141=
48) 1422 x 505=
49) 3607 x 314=
50) 5586 x 697=




Answers

1) 3865 * 880 = 3401200 2) 4117 * 663 = 2729571 3) 7499 * 247 = 1852253 4) 1846 * 515 = 950690 5) 1274 * 418 = 532532 6) 5704 * 808 = 4608832 7) 8620 * 864 = 7447680 8) 3292 * 889 = 2926588 9) 8066 * 639 = 5154174 10) 9622 * 496 = 4772512 11) 7896 * 512 = 4042752 12) 5951 * 374 = 2225674 13) 1432 * 977 = 1399064 14) 4977 * 754 = 3752658 15) 7691 * 769 = 5914379 16) 4951 * 711 = 3520161 17) 4172 * 789 = 3291708 18) 9834 * 170 = 1671780 19) 8948 * 834 = 7462632 20) 5479 * 210 = 1150590 21) 1818 * 797 = 1448946 22) 4000 * 313 = 1252000 23) 9956 * 829 = 8253524 24) 7521 * 289 = 2173569 25) 2328 * 120 = 279360 26) 9929 * 538 = 5341802 27) 1901 * 778 = 1478978 28) 9461 * 898 = 8495978 29) 2823 * 266 = 750918 30) 3075 * 855 = 2629125 31) 5442 * 822 = 4473324 32) 7932 * 361 = 2863452 33) 3667 * 857 = 3142619 34) 6398 * 114 = 729372 35) 5770 * 574 = 3311980 36) 2264 * 661 = 1496504 37) 5847 * 121 = 707487 38) 2219 * 370 = 821030 39) 1130 * 843 = 952590 40) 6788 * 374 = 2538712 41) 6561 * 376 = 2466936 42) 9070 * 712 = 6457840 43) 8063 * 157 = 1265891 44) 6862 * 481 = 3300622 45) 3516 * 829 = 2914764 46) 6394 * 585 = 3740490 47) 5937 * 141 = 837117 48) 1422 * 505 = 718110 49) 3607 * 314 = 1132598 50) 5586 * 697 = 3893442

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 52

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 52

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 81

Prime numbers Worksheet 81

Percent worksheets 81

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 81

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 81

Factors worksheet81

Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Ratios worksheets 80

Prime numbers Worksheet 80

Percent worksheets 80

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets