1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 53

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 53

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on October 23, 2020.

Questions

1) 1598 x 706=
2) 2224 x 308=
3) 5712 x 177=
4) 5897 x 542=
5) 8598 x 468=
6) 2306 x 732=
7) 8432 x 534=
8) 2724 x 449=
9) 4339 x 767=
10) 7854 x 808=
11) 1905 x 431=
12) 5036 x 384=
13) 7613 x 525=
14) 8504 x 359=
15) 3009 x 535=
16) 9067 x 588=
17) 5284 x 213=
18) 3730 x 231=
19) 4787 x 297=
20) 6341 x 156=
21) 6095 x 236=
22) 8440 x 336=
23) 1820 x 565=
24) 8973 x 620=
25) 2705 x 187=
26) 4763 x 849=
27) 4283 x 767=
28) 4455 x 826=
29) 1195 x 716=
30) 9954 x 780=
31) 9689 x 200=
32) 1349 x 864=
33) 6192 x 154=
34) 9977 x 675=
35) 6216 x 557=
36) 2547 x 523=
37) 9332 x 965=
38) 8965 x 733=
39) 1664 x 615=
40) 7968 x 732=
41) 2074 x 869=
42) 9646 x 252=
43) 7715 x 449=
44) 9541 x 599=
45) 1884 x 629=
46) 4894 x 509=
47) 1291 x 768=
48) 4829 x 994=
49) 4224 x 800=
50) 8771 x 673=




Answers

1) 1598 * 706 = 1128188 2) 2224 * 308 = 684992 3) 5712 * 177 = 1011024 4) 5897 * 542 = 3196174 5) 8598 * 468 = 4023864 6) 2306 * 732 = 1687992 7) 8432 * 534 = 4502688 8) 2724 * 449 = 1223076 9) 4339 * 767 = 3328013 10) 7854 * 808 = 6346032 11) 1905 * 431 = 821055 12) 5036 * 384 = 1933824 13) 7613 * 525 = 3996825 14) 8504 * 359 = 3052936 15) 3009 * 535 = 1609815 16) 9067 * 588 = 5331396 17) 5284 * 213 = 1125492 18) 3730 * 231 = 861630 19) 4787 * 297 = 1421739 20) 6341 * 156 = 989196 21) 6095 * 236 = 1438420 22) 8440 * 336 = 2835840 23) 1820 * 565 = 1028300 24) 8973 * 620 = 5563260 25) 2705 * 187 = 505835 26) 4763 * 849 = 4043787 27) 4283 * 767 = 3285061 28) 4455 * 826 = 3679830 29) 1195 * 716 = 855620 30) 9954 * 780 = 7764120 31) 9689 * 200 = 1937800 32) 1349 * 864 = 1165536 33) 6192 * 154 = 953568 34) 9977 * 675 = 6734475 35) 6216 * 557 = 3462312 36) 2547 * 523 = 1332081 37) 9332 * 965 = 9005380 38) 8965 * 733 = 6571345 39) 1664 * 615 = 1023360 40) 7968 * 732 = 5832576 41) 2074 * 869 = 1802306 42) 9646 * 252 = 2430792 43) 7715 * 449 = 3464035 44) 9541 * 599 = 5715059 45) 1884 * 629 = 1185036 46) 4894 * 509 = 2491046 47) 1291 * 768 = 991488 48) 4829 * 994 = 4800026 49) 4224 * 800 = 3379200 50) 8771 * 673 = 5902883

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 53

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 53

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 91

Prime numbers Worksheet 91

Percent worksheets 91

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 91

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 91

Factors worksheet91

Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Ratios worksheets 90

Prime numbers Worksheet 90

Percent worksheets 90

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets