1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 54

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 54

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on October 24, 2020.

Questions

1) 2123 x 335=
2) 9057 x 920=
3) 3096 x 810=
4) 7619 x 628=
5) 2160 x 249=
6) 5877 x 883=
7) 3013 x 335=
8) 7183 x 293=
9) 4021 x 547=
10) 2241 x 821=
11) 1007 x 992=
12) 5129 x 128=
13) 6560 x 428=
14) 4458 x 869=
15) 5637 x 227=
16) 3828 x 512=
17) 1302 x 995=
18) 5757 x 139=
19) 8876 x 478=
20) 2901 x 324=
21) 6694 x 761=
22) 8058 x 424=
23) 5161 x 385=
24) 9167 x 906=
25) 6591 x 792=
26) 1658 x 937=
27) 9486 x 810=
28) 6163 x 882=
29) 6976 x 490=
30) 3565 x 252=
31) 3284 x 339=
32) 7871 x 255=
33) 8708 x 687=
34) 3017 x 165=
35) 2688 x 205=
36) 7493 x 654=
37) 1923 x 116=
38) 3669 x 911=
39) 1068 x 457=
40) 9273 x 939=
41) 6548 x 219=
42) 8200 x 641=
43) 3845 x 310=
44) 8871 x 748=
45) 3932 x 961=
46) 5085 x 378=
47) 6356 x 254=
48) 8100 x 522=
49) 3388 x 778=
50) 6722 x 618=




Answers

1) 2123 * 335 = 711205 2) 9057 * 920 = 8332440 3) 3096 * 810 = 2507760 4) 7619 * 628 = 4784732 5) 2160 * 249 = 537840 6) 5877 * 883 = 5189391 7) 3013 * 335 = 1009355 8) 7183 * 293 = 2104619 9) 4021 * 547 = 2199487 10) 2241 * 821 = 1839861 11) 1007 * 992 = 998944 12) 5129 * 128 = 656512 13) 6560 * 428 = 2807680 14) 4458 * 869 = 3874002 15) 5637 * 227 = 1279599 16) 3828 * 512 = 1959936 17) 1302 * 995 = 1295490 18) 5757 * 139 = 800223 19) 8876 * 478 = 4242728 20) 2901 * 324 = 939924 21) 6694 * 761 = 5094134 22) 8058 * 424 = 3416592 23) 5161 * 385 = 1986985 24) 9167 * 906 = 8305302 25) 6591 * 792 = 5220072 26) 1658 * 937 = 1553546 27) 9486 * 810 = 7683660 28) 6163 * 882 = 5435766 29) 6976 * 490 = 3418240 30) 3565 * 252 = 898380 31) 3284 * 339 = 1113276 32) 7871 * 255 = 2007105 33) 8708 * 687 = 5982396 34) 3017 * 165 = 497805 35) 2688 * 205 = 551040 36) 7493 * 654 = 4900422 37) 1923 * 116 = 223068 38) 3669 * 911 = 3342459 39) 1068 * 457 = 488076 40) 9273 * 939 = 8707347 41) 6548 * 219 = 1434012 42) 8200 * 641 = 5256200 43) 3845 * 310 = 1191950 44) 8871 * 748 = 6635508 45) 3932 * 961 = 3778652 46) 5085 * 378 = 1922130 47) 6356 * 254 = 1614424 48) 8100 * 522 = 4228200 49) 3388 * 778 = 2635864 50) 6722 * 618 = 4154196

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 54

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 54

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 91

Prime numbers Worksheet 91

Percent worksheets 91

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 91

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 91

Factors worksheet91

Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Ratios worksheets 90

Prime numbers Worksheet 90

Percent worksheets 90

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets