1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 55

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 55

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 25, 2020.

Questions

1) 1545 x 535=
2) 5701 x 152=
3) 1101 x 414=
4) 6367 x 303=
5) 6404 x 869=
6) 3552 x 693=
7) 9953 x 706=
8) 4856 x 325=
9) 6495 x 847=
10) 4102 x 114=
11) 1805 x 211=
12) 5223 x 819=
13) 1315 x 810=
14) 3481 x 915=
15) 4128 x 324=
16) 9615 x 326=
17) 3953 x 614=
18) 4557 x 819=
19) 1542 x 439=
20) 7938 x 881=
21) 5756 x 968=
22) 1858 x 193=
23) 6417 x 947=
24) 7823 x 807=
25) 4508 x 329=
26) 3749 x 769=
27) 5367 x 183=
28) 7221 x 932=
29) 5139 x 536=
30) 8533 x 260=
31) 9572 x 358=
32) 6977 x 866=
33) 9934 x 329=
34) 5743 x 259=
35) 7834 x 160=
36) 1146 x 651=
37) 6978 x 387=
38) 9499 x 317=
39) 8600 x 927=
40) 5852 x 457=
41) 3050 x 140=
42) 8231 x 878=
43) 2066 x 876=
44) 5804 x 735=
45) 8397 x 553=
46) 7801 x 132=
47) 8852 x 525=
48) 8455 x 519=
49) 7236 x 147=
50) 9077 x 679=




Answers

1) 1545 * 535 = 826575 2) 5701 * 152 = 866552 3) 1101 * 414 = 455814 4) 6367 * 303 = 1929201 5) 6404 * 869 = 5565076 6) 3552 * 693 = 2461536 7) 9953 * 706 = 7026818 8) 4856 * 325 = 1578200 9) 6495 * 847 = 5501265 10) 4102 * 114 = 467628 11) 1805 * 211 = 380855 12) 5223 * 819 = 4277637 13) 1315 * 810 = 1065150 14) 3481 * 915 = 3185115 15) 4128 * 324 = 1337472 16) 9615 * 326 = 3134490 17) 3953 * 614 = 2427142 18) 4557 * 819 = 3732183 19) 1542 * 439 = 676938 20) 7938 * 881 = 6993378 21) 5756 * 968 = 5571808 22) 1858 * 193 = 358594 23) 6417 * 947 = 6076899 24) 7823 * 807 = 6313161 25) 4508 * 329 = 1483132 26) 3749 * 769 = 2882981 27) 5367 * 183 = 982161 28) 7221 * 932 = 6729972 29) 5139 * 536 = 2754504 30) 8533 * 260 = 2218580 31) 9572 * 358 = 3426776 32) 6977 * 866 = 6042082 33) 9934 * 329 = 3268286 34) 5743 * 259 = 1487437 35) 7834 * 160 = 1253440 36) 1146 * 651 = 746046 37) 6978 * 387 = 2700486 38) 9499 * 317 = 3011183 39) 8600 * 927 = 7972200 40) 5852 * 457 = 2674364 41) 3050 * 140 = 427000 42) 8231 * 878 = 7226818 43) 2066 * 876 = 1809816 44) 5804 * 735 = 4265940 45) 8397 * 553 = 4643541 46) 7801 * 132 = 1029732 47) 8852 * 525 = 4647300 48) 8455 * 519 = 4388145 49) 7236 * 147 = 1063692 50) 9077 * 679 = 6163283

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 55

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 55

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 81

Prime numbers Worksheet 81

Percent worksheets 81

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 81

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 81

Factors worksheet81

Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Ratios worksheets 80

Prime numbers Worksheet 80

Percent worksheets 80

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets