1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 56

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 56

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on October 26, 2020.

Questions

1) 9927 x 362=
2) 9307 x 449=
3) 5254 x 581=
4) 7936 x 619=
5) 9580 x 970=
6) 7680 x 627=
7) 7325 x 240=
8) 2607 x 531=
9) 4771 x 675=
10) 9755 x 295=
11) 2188 x 553=
12) 5094 x 562=
13) 5550 x 298=
14) 8560 x 534=
15) 7465 x 131=
16) 6987 x 621=
17) 7940 x 778=
18) 9144 x 696=
19) 2395 x 371=
20) 3856 x 483=
21) 2628 x 840=
22) 1642 x 935=
23) 4311 x 328=
24) 2341 x 673=
25) 9307 x 252=
26) 3955 x 964=
27) 5641 x 964=
28) 3386 x 462=
29) 2136 x 770=
30) 4670 x 815=
31) 7900 x 374=
32) 4658 x 535=
33) 4267 x 506=
34) 7913 x 743=
35) 7695 x 602=
36) 4666 x 915=
37) 5368 x 960=
38) 8887 x 830=
39) 1916 x 961=
40) 1423 x 587=
41) 9786 x 556=
42) 8993 x 698=
43) 9578 x 240=
44) 1088 x 920=
45) 4113 x 389=
46) 2022 x 508=
47) 2232 x 168=
48) 5806 x 486=
49) 3746 x 348=
50) 1971 x 683=




Answers

1) 9927 * 362 = 3593574 2) 9307 * 449 = 4178843 3) 5254 * 581 = 3052574 4) 7936 * 619 = 4912384 5) 9580 * 970 = 9292600 6) 7680 * 627 = 4815360 7) 7325 * 240 = 1758000 8) 2607 * 531 = 1384317 9) 4771 * 675 = 3220425 10) 9755 * 295 = 2877725 11) 2188 * 553 = 1209964 12) 5094 * 562 = 2862828 13) 5550 * 298 = 1653900 14) 8560 * 534 = 4571040 15) 7465 * 131 = 977915 16) 6987 * 621 = 4338927 17) 7940 * 778 = 6177320 18) 9144 * 696 = 6364224 19) 2395 * 371 = 888545 20) 3856 * 483 = 1862448 21) 2628 * 840 = 2207520 22) 1642 * 935 = 1535270 23) 4311 * 328 = 1414008 24) 2341 * 673 = 1575493 25) 9307 * 252 = 2345364 26) 3955 * 964 = 3812620 27) 5641 * 964 = 5437924 28) 3386 * 462 = 1564332 29) 2136 * 770 = 1644720 30) 4670 * 815 = 3806050 31) 7900 * 374 = 2954600 32) 4658 * 535 = 2492030 33) 4267 * 506 = 2159102 34) 7913 * 743 = 5879359 35) 7695 * 602 = 4632390 36) 4666 * 915 = 4269390 37) 5368 * 960 = 5153280 38) 8887 * 830 = 7376210 39) 1916 * 961 = 1841276 40) 1423 * 587 = 835301 41) 9786 * 556 = 5441016 42) 8993 * 698 = 6277114 43) 9578 * 240 = 2298720 44) 1088 * 920 = 1000960 45) 4113 * 389 = 1599957 46) 2022 * 508 = 1027176 47) 2232 * 168 = 374976 48) 5806 * 486 = 2821716 49) 3746 * 348 = 1303608 50) 1971 * 683 = 1346193

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 56

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 56

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 89

Prime numbers Worksheet 89

Percent worksheets 89

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 89

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 89

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 89

Factors worksheet89

Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Ratios worksheets 88

Prime numbers Worksheet 88

Percent worksheets 88

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets