1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 57

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 57

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on October 27, 2020.

Questions

1) 5744 x 226=
2) 3693 x 229=
3) 5590 x 734=
4) 7160 x 923=
5) 4977 x 858=
6) 3531 x 971=
7) 8647 x 300=
8) 1650 x 118=
9) 6009 x 945=
10) 3455 x 833=
11) 4380 x 133=
12) 5414 x 140=
13) 9667 x 792=
14) 1860 x 854=
15) 7919 x 283=
16) 5937 x 699=
17) 1117 x 202=
18) 8351 x 103=
19) 7046 x 624=
20) 5676 x 992=
21) 4487 x 164=
22) 4549 x 429=
23) 5478 x 801=
24) 5549 x 120=
25) 1735 x 394=
26) 4905 x 251=
27) 8676 x 576=
28) 9182 x 931=
29) 7411 x 293=
30) 8168 x 621=
31) 8462 x 224=
32) 6013 x 451=
33) 9395 x 571=
34) 4633 x 911=
35) 3722 x 756=
36) 5512 x 170=
37) 2750 x 565=
38) 7180 x 738=
39) 6413 x 162=
40) 8699 x 474=
41) 9102 x 757=
42) 6461 x 224=
43) 2250 x 150=
44) 5242 x 939=
45) 3869 x 335=
46) 6549 x 733=
47) 3171 x 805=
48) 5388 x 875=
49) 7549 x 270=
50) 6664 x 117=




Answers

1) 5744 * 226 = 1298144 2) 3693 * 229 = 845697 3) 5590 * 734 = 4103060 4) 7160 * 923 = 6608680 5) 4977 * 858 = 4270266 6) 3531 * 971 = 3428601 7) 8647 * 300 = 2594100 8) 1650 * 118 = 194700 9) 6009 * 945 = 5678505 10) 3455 * 833 = 2878015 11) 4380 * 133 = 582540 12) 5414 * 140 = 757960 13) 9667 * 792 = 7656264 14) 1860 * 854 = 1588440 15) 7919 * 283 = 2241077 16) 5937 * 699 = 4149963 17) 1117 * 202 = 225634 18) 8351 * 103 = 860153 19) 7046 * 624 = 4396704 20) 5676 * 992 = 5630592 21) 4487 * 164 = 735868 22) 4549 * 429 = 1951521 23) 5478 * 801 = 4387878 24) 5549 * 120 = 665880 25) 1735 * 394 = 683590 26) 4905 * 251 = 1231155 27) 8676 * 576 = 4997376 28) 9182 * 931 = 8548442 29) 7411 * 293 = 2171423 30) 8168 * 621 = 5072328 31) 8462 * 224 = 1895488 32) 6013 * 451 = 2711863 33) 9395 * 571 = 5364545 34) 4633 * 911 = 4220663 35) 3722 * 756 = 2813832 36) 5512 * 170 = 937040 37) 2750 * 565 = 1553750 38) 7180 * 738 = 5298840 39) 6413 * 162 = 1038906 40) 8699 * 474 = 4123326 41) 9102 * 757 = 6890214 42) 6461 * 224 = 1447264 43) 2250 * 150 = 337500 44) 5242 * 939 = 4922238 45) 3869 * 335 = 1296115 46) 6549 * 733 = 4800417 47) 3171 * 805 = 2552655 48) 5388 * 875 = 4714500 49) 7549 * 270 = 2038230 50) 6664 * 117 = 779688

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 57

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 57

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 89

Prime numbers Worksheet 89

Percent worksheets 89

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 89

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 89

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 89

Factors worksheet89

Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Ratios worksheets 88

Prime numbers Worksheet 88

Percent worksheets 88

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets