1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 58

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 58

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on October 28, 2020.

Questions

1) 6453 x 138=
2) 1512 x 937=
3) 8797 x 499=
4) 6962 x 862=
5) 5557 x 378=
6) 1721 x 184=
7) 5561 x 497=
8) 4485 x 459=
9) 2367 x 868=
10) 9792 x 802=
11) 3488 x 940=
12) 4530 x 536=
13) 6587 x 265=
14) 3649 x 509=
15) 1958 x 187=
16) 4398 x 760=
17) 1039 x 416=
18) 9247 x 595=
19) 4064 x 285=
20) 2366 x 813=
21) 9603 x 593=
22) 9755 x 469=
23) 9145 x 627=
24) 7036 x 166=
25) 7084 x 744=
26) 1934 x 539=
27) 7690 x 968=
28) 4561 x 892=
29) 2048 x 283=
30) 1317 x 454=
31) 8285 x 957=
32) 8091 x 257=
33) 7273 x 384=
34) 9354 x 932=
35) 2011 x 839=
36) 9202 x 123=
37) 9376 x 608=
38) 3142 x 351=
39) 9238 x 582=
40) 1881 x 335=
41) 2294 x 272=
42) 5839 x 631=
43) 2639 x 420=
44) 3443 x 627=
45) 6582 x 590=
46) 9510 x 115=
47) 3195 x 503=
48) 6958 x 332=
49) 2716 x 646=
50) 1895 x 638=




Answers

1) 6453 * 138 = 890514 2) 1512 * 937 = 1416744 3) 8797 * 499 = 4389703 4) 6962 * 862 = 6001244 5) 5557 * 378 = 2100546 6) 1721 * 184 = 316664 7) 5561 * 497 = 2763817 8) 4485 * 459 = 2058615 9) 2367 * 868 = 2054556 10) 9792 * 802 = 7853184 11) 3488 * 940 = 3278720 12) 4530 * 536 = 2428080 13) 6587 * 265 = 1745555 14) 3649 * 509 = 1857341 15) 1958 * 187 = 366146 16) 4398 * 760 = 3342480 17) 1039 * 416 = 432224 18) 9247 * 595 = 5501965 19) 4064 * 285 = 1158240 20) 2366 * 813 = 1923558 21) 9603 * 593 = 5694579 22) 9755 * 469 = 4575095 23) 9145 * 627 = 5733915 24) 7036 * 166 = 1167976 25) 7084 * 744 = 5270496 26) 1934 * 539 = 1042426 27) 7690 * 968 = 7443920 28) 4561 * 892 = 4068412 29) 2048 * 283 = 579584 30) 1317 * 454 = 597918 31) 8285 * 957 = 7928745 32) 8091 * 257 = 2079387 33) 7273 * 384 = 2792832 34) 9354 * 932 = 8717928 35) 2011 * 839 = 1687229 36) 9202 * 123 = 1131846 37) 9376 * 608 = 5700608 38) 3142 * 351 = 1102842 39) 9238 * 582 = 5376516 40) 1881 * 335 = 630135 41) 2294 * 272 = 623968 42) 5839 * 631 = 3684409 43) 2639 * 420 = 1108380 44) 3443 * 627 = 2158761 45) 6582 * 590 = 3883380 46) 9510 * 115 = 1093650 47) 3195 * 503 = 1607085 48) 6958 * 332 = 2310056 49) 2716 * 646 = 1754536 50) 1895 * 638 = 1209010

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 58

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 58

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 91

Prime numbers Worksheet 91

Percent worksheets 91

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 91

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 91

Factors worksheet91

Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Ratios worksheets 90

Prime numbers Worksheet 90

Percent worksheets 90

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets