1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 59

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 59

Last updated on December 3, 2020. Created on October 29, 2020.

Questions

1) 7910 x 718=
2) 4373 x 140=
3) 7832 x 594=
4) 8623 x 123=
5) 4963 x 492=
6) 6678 x 352=
7) 1148 x 997=
8) 2599 x 692=
9) 2872 x 316=
10) 7356 x 437=
11) 7132 x 756=
12) 9111 x 545=
13) 5449 x 570=
14) 6729 x 548=
15) 4862 x 155=
16) 5037 x 520=
17) 6310 x 886=
18) 8366 x 965=
19) 2468 x 607=
20) 8680 x 693=
21) 1311 x 227=
22) 1024 x 603=
23) 5516 x 235=
24) 4847 x 127=
25) 8510 x 276=
26) 6622 x 877=
27) 4152 x 873=
28) 9370 x 139=
29) 2770 x 149=
30) 5258 x 800=
31) 6589 x 480=
32) 1997 x 567=
33) 8749 x 919=
34) 4135 x 961=
35) 8670 x 626=
36) 6392 x 319=
37) 8408 x 934=
38) 1970 x 581=
39) 7239 x 513=
40) 8063 x 373=
41) 8078 x 669=
42) 7681 x 343=
43) 3546 x 509=
44) 1552 x 613=
45) 6039 x 847=
46) 5768 x 925=
47) 2306 x 477=
48) 4952 x 904=
49) 8240 x 428=
50) 4396 x 193=




Answers

1) 7910 * 718 = 5679380 2) 4373 * 140 = 612220 3) 7832 * 594 = 4652208 4) 8623 * 123 = 1060629 5) 4963 * 492 = 2441796 6) 6678 * 352 = 2350656 7) 1148 * 997 = 1144556 8) 2599 * 692 = 1798508 9) 2872 * 316 = 907552 10) 7356 * 437 = 3214572 11) 7132 * 756 = 5391792 12) 9111 * 545 = 4965495 13) 5449 * 570 = 3105930 14) 6729 * 548 = 3687492 15) 4862 * 155 = 753610 16) 5037 * 520 = 2619240 17) 6310 * 886 = 5590660 18) 8366 * 965 = 8073190 19) 2468 * 607 = 1498076 20) 8680 * 693 = 6015240 21) 1311 * 227 = 297597 22) 1024 * 603 = 617472 23) 5516 * 235 = 1296260 24) 4847 * 127 = 615569 25) 8510 * 276 = 2348760 26) 6622 * 877 = 5807494 27) 4152 * 873 = 3624696 28) 9370 * 139 = 1302430 29) 2770 * 149 = 412730 30) 5258 * 800 = 4206400 31) 6589 * 480 = 3162720 32) 1997 * 567 = 1132299 33) 8749 * 919 = 8040331 34) 4135 * 961 = 3973735 35) 8670 * 626 = 5427420 36) 6392 * 319 = 2039048 37) 8408 * 934 = 7853072 38) 1970 * 581 = 1144570 39) 7239 * 513 = 3713607 40) 8063 * 373 = 3007499 41) 8078 * 669 = 5404182 42) 7681 * 343 = 2634583 43) 3546 * 509 = 1804914 44) 1552 * 613 = 951376 45) 6039 * 847 = 5115033 46) 5768 * 925 = 5335400 47) 2306 * 477 = 1099962 48) 4952 * 904 = 4476608 49) 8240 * 428 = 3526720 50) 4396 * 193 = 848428

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 59

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 59

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 94

Prime numbers Worksheet 94

Percent worksheets 94

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 94

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 94

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 94

Factors worksheet94

Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Ratios worksheets 93

Prime numbers Worksheet 93

Percent worksheets 93

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets